EP3197953 - IMPACT-RESISTANT MOULDING MATERIAL WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTIC PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/31] | IMPACT-RESISTANT MOLDING MATERIAL HAVING AN IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS PROFILE | ||
[2018/10] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Deutsche-Telekom-Allee 9 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Dolivostrasse 17 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖSSEL, Lukas Friedrich Holzhofallee 12 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Reiner Schillerstrasse 12 64584 Biebesheim / DE | 03 /
HÖSS, Werner Im Kleepfad 1 64409 Messel / DE | 04 /
KLITSCH, Julian Pfarrer-Papon-Strasse 45 64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Röhm Patent Association IP Management Deutsche-Telekom-Allee 9 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15763601.0 | 16.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015EP71216 | Priority number, date | EP20140186197 | 24.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14186197 | [2017/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046043 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197953 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3197953 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/12 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
C08L33/12 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C08F265/06 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C08F2/24 (KR);
C08F220/1804 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C08F220/40 (KR);
C08F285/00 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C08L25/12 (KR);
C08L51/003 (KR);
C08L51/04 (KR);
C08F220/1802 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C08L2205/06 (KR,US);
C08L2207/53 (KR,US);
C08L51/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L33/12, C08L51/003 (US,CN,EP);
C08L33/12, C08L51/04 (CN,EP,US);
C08F220/1804, C08F212/08, C08F220/40 (EP,US,RU,KR,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGZÄH AUSGERÜSTETE FORMMASSE MIT VERBESSERTEM EIGENSCHAFTSPROFIL | [2017/31] | English: | IMPACT-RESISTANT MOULDING MATERIAL WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTIC PROFILE | [2018/10] | French: | MASSE DE FORMAGE ÉQUIPÉE D'UNE RÉSISTANCE AUX CHOCS DOTÉE DE PROPRIÉTÉS SPÉCIFIQUES AMÉLIORÉES | [2018/10] |
Former [2017/31] | IMPACT-RESISTANT MOLDING MATERIAL HAVING AN IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS PROFILE | ||
Former [2017/31] | MATIÈRE DE MOULAGE RÉSISTANTE AUX CHOCS, À PROPRIÉTÉS AMÉLIORÉES | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 14.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2019
27.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2020/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2019
27.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2019/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2019
27.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Senff, Holger ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 11.03.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.07.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2020 | 29.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.09.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.09.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 16.11.2021 | Appeal received No. T2015/21 | 16.11.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 18.01.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | MT | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IE | 16.09.2018 | LU | 16.09.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | AT | 16.09.2020 | [2022/07] |
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MK | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MK | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2004056893 (ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) | Opposition | US3793402 | US5270397 | JPH0948822 | US6172135 | US2003125465 | EP1350812 | JP2003315254 | US2005148716 | US2006052515 | WO2012130595 |