EP3194379 - BENZYL SUBSTITUTED INDAZOLES AS BUB1 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENGEL, Anne Kavalierstr. 15 13187 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LERCHEN, Hans-Georg Sürderstr.3 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
MÖWES, Manfred Maßmannstr. 9 12163 Berlin / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Thomas Wiesenau 30-32 60323 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
BÄRFACKER, Lars Ulenberg Str. 3d 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
HITCHCOCK, Marion 1471 Beacon Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 07 /
CLEVE, Arwed Konstanzer Str. 8 10707 Berlin / DE | 08 /
KUHNKE, Joachim Schulstr. 16 14482 Potsdam / DE | 09 /
BRIEM, Hans Emser Str. 3 Berlin 10719 / DE | 10 /
SIEMEISTER, Gerhard Reimerswalder Steig 26 13503 Berlin / DE | 11 /
BONE, Wilhelm Drewitzer Str. 46 13467 Berlin / DE | 12 /
FERNANDEZ-MONTALVAN, Amaury Ernesto Kopenhagener Str. 42 10437 Berlin / DE | 13 /
SCHRÖDER, Jens Chausseestrasse 50b 10115 Berlin / DE | 14 /
MÖNNING, Ursula Eichendamm 5 15569 Woltersdorf / DE | 15 /
HOLTON, Simon Niklasstr. 14a 14163 Berlin / DE | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 15763619.2 | 17.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015EP71340 | Priority number, date | EP20140185604 | 19.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14185604 | EP20150176903 | 15.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15176903 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016042084 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194379 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/14, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | 19.04.2017 | ME | 19.04.2017 | Validation states | MA | 19.04.2017 | Title | German: | BENZYLSUBSTITUIERTE INDAZOLE ALS BUB1-INHIBITOREN | [2017/30] | English: | BENZYL SUBSTITUTED INDAZOLES AS BUB1 INHIBITORS | [2017/30] | French: | INDAZOLES À SUBSTITUANTS BENZYLE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE BUB1 | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 02.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2013050438 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [XD] 18 * compound 2-51-1; page 178; claims 1, 10-17 *[I] 1-21 | by applicant | US5011472 | WO2013050438 | WO2013092512 | WO2013167698 | WO2014147203 | WO2014147204 | WO2014202590 | WO2014202588 | WO2014202584 | WO2014202583 | WO2015063003 | - HANAHAN D; WEINBERG RA, CELL, (2000), vol. 100, page 57 | - HANAHAN D; WEINBERG RA, CELL, (2011), vol. 144, page 646 | - SUIJKERBUIJK SJ; KOPS GJ, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2008), vol. 1786, page 24 | - MUSACCHIO A; SALMON ED, NAT. REV. MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2007), vol. 8, page 379 | - BOLANOS-GARCIA VM; BLUNDELL TL, TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (2010), vol. 36, page 141 | - YUAN B ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 12, page 405 | - ROBERTS BT ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, page 8282 | - ELOWE S, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2011), vol. 31, page 3085 | - KAWASHIMA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, page 172 | - WATANABE Y, COLD SPRING HARB. SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (2010), vol. 75, page 419 | - RICKE ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (2012), vol. 199, pages 931 - 949 | - WEAVER BA; CLEVELAND DW, CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 67, page 10103 | - KING RW, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2008), vol. 1786, page 4 | - KOPS GJ ET AL., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2005), vol. 5, page 773 | - SCHMIDT M; MEDEMA RH, CELL CYCLE, (2006), vol. 5, page 159 | - SCHMIDT M; BASTIANS H, DRUG RES. UPDATES, (2007), vol. 10, page 162 | - RIEDER CL; MAIATO H, DEV. CELL, (2004), vol. 7, page 637 | - PURE APPL CHEM, (1976), vol. 45, pages 11 - 30 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - AIELLO ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1994), vol. 331, page 1480 | - PEER ET AL., LAB. INVEST., (1995), vol. 72, page 638 | - LOPEZ ET AL., INVEST. OPTHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1996), vol. 37, page 855 | - POWELL, M.F. ET AL., "Compendium of Excipients for Parenteral Formulations", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027 | - STRICKLEY, R.G, "Parenteral Formulations of Small Molecule Therapeutics Marketed in the United States (1999)-Part-1", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 324 - 349 | - NEMA, S. ET AL., "Excipients and Their Use in Injectable Products", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 166 - 171 | - Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 1225 - 1287 |