EP3191042 - PROCESS FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE COMPRISING A TOPSHEET/ACQUISITION LAYER LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSATI, Rodrigo Sulzbacherstrasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 02 /
ORR, Jill, M. One Procter&Gamble Plaza C8 Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
GRENIER, Adrien Sulzbacherstrasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 04 /
KNAPMEYER, James, T. One Procter&Gamble Plaza C8 Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 05 /
CHATTERJEE, Aniruddha Sulzbacherstrasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Heide, Ute Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | Heide, Ute Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 15763769.5 | 03.09.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015US48303 | Priority number, date | US201462049397P | 12.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462049397 P | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016040091 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3191042 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
A61F13/15699 (EP,CN);
A61F13/15707 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKELS MIT EINER DECKSCHICHT/EINEM AUFNAHMESCHICHTLAMINAT | [2017/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE COMPRISING A TOPSHEET/ACQUISITION LAYER LAMINATE | [2017/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT UN STRATIFIÉ DE COUCHE D'ACQUISITION/FEUILLE SUPÉRIEURE | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 28.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2012234475 (PALDEY SOHINI [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0069] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0111] * * paragraphs [0134] - [0136] * * paragraphs [0113] - [0117] * [Y] 2,3,12-15 [I] 6-11; | [Y]US5599335 (GOLDMAN STEPHEN A [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figure 1 * * column 31, line 51 - column 33, line 6 *; | [Y]US2004265534 (CURRO JOHN JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2010310810 (BOND ERIC BRYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004002688 (THOMAS PAUL EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012064298 (ORR JILL MARLENE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |