EP2998353 - FLOORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/12] | PVC COMPOSITE MATERIAL, FOAMING BOARD AND PRODUCTION METHOD, EQUIPMENT AND FLOOR | ||
[2016/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Tianzhen Bamboo & Wood Development Co. Ltd. Wellness Industry Park Anji Economic Development Area Anji County Huzhou, Zhejiang 313300 / CN | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Qinghua Wellness Industry Park Anji Economic Development Area Anji County Huzhou Zhejiang 313300 / CN | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | ||
Former [2016/12] | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 1TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15764426.1 | 06.02.2015 | [2016/12] | WO2015CN72382 | Priority number, date | CN201410106959 | 21.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410106959 | [2016/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015139541 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998353 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2998353 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/10, // B32B3/06, B32B27/06, B32B27/30, C08J9/00, C08J9/08, C08J9/10 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
C08J9/127 (US);
B32B27/065 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
B32B3/06 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (US);
C08J9/0014 (EP,US);
C08J9/0023 (EP,US);
C08J9/0052 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08J9/0095 (EP,US);
C08J9/08 (EP,US);
C08J9/103 (EP,US);
C08J9/36 (US);
E04F15/105 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2250/246 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0235 (EP,US);
B32B2305/022 (US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2419/00 (US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,US);
C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2203/02 (EP,US);
C08J2203/04 (EP,US);
C08J2203/18 (EP,US);
C08J2205/052 (EP,US);
C08J2327/06 (EP,US);
C08J2423/06 (EP,US);
C08J2423/28 (EP,US);
C08J2433/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C08J9/00, C08J9/08, C08J9/10, // B32B3/06, B32B27/06, B32B27/30 | ||
Former IPC [2016/12] | C08L27/06, C08K3/26, C08K5/23, C08J9/08, C08J9/10, B29C44/30, B29C47/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSSBODEN-PLATTE | [2016/48] | English: | FLOORING | [2016/48] | French: | PANNEAU DE PLANCHER | [2016/48] |
Former [2016/12] | PVC-VERBUNDMATERIAL, SCHAUMSTOFFPLATTE SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, AUSRÜSTUNG SOWIE BODEN | ||
Former [2016/12] | PVC COMPOSITE MATERIAL, FOAMING BOARD AND PRODUCTION METHOD, EQUIPMENT AND FLOOR | ||
Former [2016/12] | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE À BASE DE PVC, CARTON MOUSSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ÉQUIPEMENT ET PLANCHER | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | Translation filed | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2015 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | IE | 06.02.2018 | LU | 06.02.2018 | MT | 06.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.02.2015 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 06.02.2015 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN102492244 ; | [XA]CN102964740 ; | [XA]CN101407613 ; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 51, Database accession no. 2012-J01633, XP002755201 & CN102492244 A 20120613 (SHANDONG BOTUO PLASTIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0013] * [I] 4,5,7,8 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 01, Database accession no. 2013-J73383, XP002755202 & CN102964740 A 20130313 (SHANDONG BOTUO PLASTIC IND CO LTD) [X] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0015] * [A] 1-7 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 39, Database accession no. 2009-H64524, XP002755203 & CN101407613 A 20090415 (HU D) [X] 8 * abstract * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 22 * * example 1 * [A] 1-7,9,10 | International search | [YA]CN102321318 (ANHUI GUANGDE JINPENG NEW MATERIAL MANUFACTURE CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * description, paragraphs [0008]-[0018] description, paragraphs [0008]-[0018] * [A] 8-10; | [YA]CN102492244 (SHANDONG BOTUO PLASTIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * claim 1, description, paragraphs [0004]-[0013] and embodiment 1 claim 1, description, paragraphs [0004]-[0013] and embodiment 1 * [A] 8-10; | [YX]CN102964740 (SHANDONG EXTENSION PLASTICS CO LTD) [Y] 4-7 * claim 1, description, embodiment 1 claim 1, description, embodiment 1 * [X] 8; | [PX]CN103865208 (ZHEJIANG TAPZEN BAMBOO & WOOD DEV CO LTD) [PX] 1-10* claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0004]-[0021] * |