Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
21.04.2018 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
20.04.2018 | Change - classification | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
12.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.05.2017 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
26.05.2017 | Change - extension states | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
16.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.01.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
23.12.2016 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.12.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
02.12.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.11.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.11.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2016 | Change - representative | |
21.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.10.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.09.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |