EP3121474 - CLUTCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASAKI, Shoichi c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
SHIOZAKI, Taro c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2017/09] |
Former [2017/04] | 01 /
YAMASAKI, Shoichi c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIOZAKI, Taro c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMADA, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15764810.6 | 19.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015JP58388 | Priority number, date | JP20140059154 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014059154 | [2017/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015141813 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121474 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/75, F16D13/69, F16D25/12, F16D28/00, F16D13/64, F16D21/06 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
F16D13/757 (EP);
F16D28/00 (EP);
F16D2013/642 (EP);
F16D2021/0646 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | F16D13/75, F16D13/69, F16D25/12, F16D28/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/04] | English: | CLUTCH DEVICE | [2017/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMBRAYAGE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2016 | Translation filed | 15.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 15.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19510905 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 5 * * column 5, line 27 - column 9, line 44; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP1245850 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0015] - [0050] - [0073] - paragraphs [0085] , [0089]; figures 2-7 *; | [A]US5816379 (DE BRIEL JACQUES THIRION [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 30 - line 40 * * column 2, line 35 - line 67 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1112451 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORP [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0028]; figure 1 * | International search | [XY]JPH07317803 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU) [X] 1-2, 7-9 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0061]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 5632365 A & US 5971124 A & GB 2287994 A & DE 19510905 A1 & FR 2718205 A1 & CN 1126287 A & KR 10-0392935 B1 * [Y] 3-6, 10-11; | [Y]JP2001182756 (AISIN SEIKI, et al) [Y] 3-6, 10 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0092]; fig. 1 to 19 & US 2001/0011625 A1 & EP 1111262 A2 & DE 60029189 T2 *; | [Y]JP2004060728 (AISIN SEIKI) [Y] 3-6, 10 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0116]; fig. 1 to 15 & EP 1384912 A1 & DE 60316631 T2 *; | [Y]JP2002525505 (Daimler Chrysler Corp.) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0027]; fig. 1 to 10 & US 5996754 A & WO 2000/015972 A1 & EP 1112451 B1 & DE 69922025 T2 * |