EP3125820 - PACKAGING SYSTEMS INCLUDING SACRIFICIAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultradent Products, Inc. 505 West 10200 South South Jordan, Utah 84905 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLRED, Peter M. 13821 Asherwoods Cove Bluffdale, Utah 84065 / US | 02 /
FISCHER, Dan E. 10444 South Dimple Dell Road Sandy, UT 84092 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15765697.6 | 20.02.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US16745 | Priority number, date | US201461955954P | 20.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461955954 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142471 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125820 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/02, A61K8/18, A61K8/22 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61C19/02 (EP,US);
A61C19/066 (EP,US);
A61K8/0204 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
B65D43/02 (US);
B65D65/40 (US);
B65D75/321 (US);
A61C2202/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEME MIT OPFERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/06] | English: | PACKAGING SYSTEMS INCLUDING SACRIFICIAL COMPOSITION | [2017/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION SACRIFICIELLE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 19.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003219389 (SAGEL PAUL ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1-15 *; | [Y]US7568579 (MOORE SCOTT ERIC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1A-7B *; | [Y]US2009214448 (SAGEL PAUL ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-9* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1-11 * | International search | [A]US5858332 (JENSEN STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 9/1, 9/8, 10/9/1, 10/9/8, 11/9/1, 11/9/8, 12/9/1, 12/9/8, 13/9/1, 13/9/8, 14/9/1, 14/9/8, 15/9/1, 15/9/8, 16/9/1, 16/9/8, 17/9/1, 17/9/8, 18/9/1, 18/9/8, 19/18/9/1, 19/18/9/8, 20/9/1, 20/9/8, 21-* ; entire document *; | [A]US6372816 (WALZ UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-8, 9/1, 9/8, 10/9/1, 10/9/8, 11/9/1, 11/9/8, 12/9/1, 12/9/8, 13/9/1, 13/9/8, 14/9/1, 14/9/8, 15/9/1, 15/9/8, 16/9/1, 16/9/8, 17/9/1, 17/9/8, 18/9/1, 18/9/8, 19/18/9/1, 19/18/9/8, 20/9/1, 20/9/8, 21- * ; entire document *; | [Y]US2003219389 (SAGEL PAUL ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 9/1, 9/8, 10/9/1, 10/9/8, 11/9/1, 11/9/8, 12/9/1, 12/9/8, 13/9/1, 13/9/8, 14/9/1, 14/9/8, 15/9/1, 15/9/8, 16/9/1, 16/9/8, 17/9/1, 17/9/8, 18/9/1, 18/9/8, 19/18/9/1, 19/18/9/8, 20/9/1, 20/9/8, 21- * ; abstract; paragraphs [0023]-[0024], [0044], [0046], [0053], [0059]-[0062], [0066]-[0067]; claim 14 *; | [Y]US7568579 (MOORE SCOTT ERIC [US]) [Y] 1-8, 9/1, 9/8, 10/9/1, 10/9/8, 11/9/1, 11/9/8, 12/9/1, 12/9/8, 13/9/1, 13/9/8, 14/9/1, 14/9/8, 15/9/1, 15/9/8, 16/9/1, 16/9/8, 17/9/1, 17/9/8, 18/9/1, 18/9/8, 19/18/9/1, 19/18/9/8, 20/9/1, 20/9/8, 21- * ; column 2, lines 53-56, 59-65; column 5, lines 27-33; column 6, lines 1-5; column 7, lines 54-55 *; | [Y]US2009214448 (SAGEL PAUL ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 9/1, 9/8, 10/9/1, 10/9/8, 11/9/1, 11/9/8, 12/9/1, 12/9/8, 13/9/1, 13/9/8, 14/9/1, 14/9/8, 15/9/1, 15/9/8, 16/9/1, 16/9/8, 17/9/1, 17/9/8, 18/9/1, 18/9/8, 19/18/9/1, 19/18/9/8, 20/9/1, 20/9/8, 31-34 * ; figure 10; paragraphs [0027], [0046], [0051], [0055] *; | [A]WO2010010196 (ALTING JACOBUS [BE]) [A] 1-8, 9/1, 9/8, 10/9/1, 10/9/8, 11/9/1, 11/9/8, 12/9/1, 12/9/8, 13/9/1, 13/9/8, 14/9/1, 14/9/8, 15/9/1, 15/9/8, 16/9/1, 16/9/8, 17/9/1, 17/9/8, 18/9/1, 18/9/8, 19/18/9/1, 19/18/9/8, 20/9/1, 20/9/8, 21- * ; entire document * |