EP3175465 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PERMANENT MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHBECK, Jörg Hofreuthackerstrasse 16 90482 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
DEIM, Sybille Zähringerstrasse 20 90475 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
SCHARRER, Martin Meisenweg 2 91220 Schnaittach / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15766435.0 | 15.09.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015EP71071 | Priority number, date | DE201410219378 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014219378 | [2017/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046022 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175465 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3175465 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/02, H01F41/22, C23C16/56, B22F3/10, C23C16/06 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
H01F41/22 (EP);
B22F3/1007 (EP);
C23C16/06 (EP);
C23C16/56 (EP);
H01F41/0293 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/1007, B22F3/1028, B22F2003/248 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1007, B22F2202/11, B22F2202/13 (EP) |
Former IPC [2017/23] | H01F41/02, C23C16/56, H01F41/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PERMANENTMAGNETEN | [2017/23] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PERMANENT MAGNET | [2017/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN AIMANT PERMANENT | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 22.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2015 | AL | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | MT | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IE | 15.09.2018 | LU | 15.09.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MK | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.09.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1879201 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0040] - [0042] - [0045] , [0052] - [0054] - [0058] - [0067] *; | [A]JP2012212830 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0072] , [0073] , [0100] - [0105] - [0108] *; | [A]JP2011101043 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] , [0056] , [0082] - [0084] * | Examination | US2007034299 |