EP3188819 - TRACE AND LOW CONCENTRATION CO2 REMOVAL METHODS AND APPARATUS UTILIZING METAL ORGANIC FRAMEWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Abdullah University of Science and Technology 4700 King Abdullah University Of Science and Technology Bldg. 16, Room 4518 Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDDAOUDI, Mohamed 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 02 /
BELMABKHOUT, Youssef 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 03 /
SHEKHAH, Osama 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Goulard, Sophie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 15766682.7 | 02.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US48081 | Priority number, date | US201462044928P | 02.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462044928 P | US201462044927P | 02.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462044927 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016036814 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188819 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01J20/22 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
B01J20/226 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
A61M16/22 (US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,US);
B01J20/28083 (EP,US);
H01M8/0668 (US);
B01D2253/204 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4533 (EP,US);
B01J2220/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON SPUREN UND VON NIEDRIGKONZENTRIERTEM CO2 UNTER VERWENDUNG VON METALLORGANISCHEN RAHMEN | [2017/28] | English: | TRACE AND LOW CONCENTRATION CO2 REMOVAL METHODS AND APPARATUS UTILIZING METAL ORGANIC FRAMEWORKS | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL D'ÉLIMINATION DE CO2 SOUS FORME DE TRACES ET EN FAIBLE CONCENTRATION AU MOYEN DE STRUCTURES ORGANOMÉTALLIQUES | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 15.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 24.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP20196303.0 / EP3777997 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - OSAMA SHEKHAH ET AL, "Made-to-order metal-organic frameworks for trace carbon dioxide removal and air capture", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140625), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms5228, XP055209187 [X] 1-12,14-20 * abstract * * paragraph starting with "Equally important ..."; page 2, column left * * first sentence; page 2, column left, paragraph 4th * * paragraph starting with "There is no reported ..."; page 2, column right * * paragraph starting with "In order to further ..."; page 3, column right * * page 3; figures 1a, 1b * * paragraph starting with "The pronounced steep ..."; page 5, column left * * page 6, column left, line 9 - line 10 * * last part of first paragraph starting with "It is important to notice ..."; page 6, column left * [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5228 |