|
22.12.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.12.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
16.12.2015 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.12.2015 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
38 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |