06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
28.08.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
26.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.08.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
20.10.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.02.2019 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
14.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
03.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
29.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
08.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
28.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
07.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
13.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|