Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10233034 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2017203927 | 20.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP65443 | 07.07.2015 | CH11382014 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3172155 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2020 | B1 | EP3172155 | 31.05.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP65443 | 07.07.2015 | CH11382014 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017000654 | 09.01.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP65443 | 07.07.2015 | CH11382014 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016012229 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2016 | A3 | WO2016012229 | 28.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH11382014 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH709921 | 30.09.2019 | B1 | CH709921 | 29.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH11382014 | 24.07.2014 |