EP3198634 - MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEM (MEMS) BOND RELEASE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF WAFER TRANSFER FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (3D IC) INTEGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAN, Je-Hsiung Jeffrey QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Wenyue QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
DU, Yang QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LEE, Yong Ju QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
GU, Shiqun QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
XIE, Jing QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15767645.3 | 08.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015US48930 | Priority number, date | US201414498965 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US201414498965 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016048649 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198634 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/822, H01L21/683, H01L27/06 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
H01L21/6835 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L21/8221 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L25/0657 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/02164 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/265 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/76254 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/76802 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/76877 (CN,KR,US);
H01L23/5226 (CN,KR,US);
H01L23/528 (CN,KR,US);
H01L25/50 (CN,KR,US);
H01L27/0688 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2221/68318 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2221/68363 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2221/68381 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | BINDUNGSFREIGABESTRUKTUR EINES MIKROELEKTROMECHANISCHEN SYSTEMS UND VERFAHREN FÜR WAFERTRANSFER ZUR INTEGRATION EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEM (MEMS) BOND RELEASE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF WAFER TRANSFER FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (3D IC) INTEGRATION | [2017/31] | French: | STRUCTURE DE LIBÉRATION DE LIAISON DE MICROSYSTÈME ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE (MEMS) ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE TRANCHE DE TRANCHE POUR INTÉGRATION DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ TRIDIMENSIONNEL (CI 3D) | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 16.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007135013 (FARIS SADEG M [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8-12,14 * paragraphs [0183] , [0184] , [0199] - [0201] - [0203] - [0205] - [0208] , [0211] , [0301]; figures 8,121 * [I] 2,3,7,13,15-20; | [XYI]US2014264770 (OKANDAN MURAT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] , [0039] , [0040]; figure 2A * [Y] 4-8,16-20 [I] 12,13,15; | [XYI]US2007254455 (YAMAGUCHI MAYUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13,15,21,22,25,27,31,34,35,37-40 * paragraphs [0081] - [0089] - [0 92] , [ 114] , [ 117] , [ 130]; figures 4, 5C, 6A, 8B, 9B * [Y] 4-8 [I] 14,23,24,36; | [X]US8729673 (OKANDAN MURAT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,16 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 57; figures 2A-2C * * column 6, line 13 - line 16 *; | [A]US2002171080 (FARIS SADEG M [US]) [A] 4-8 * paragraph [0050]; figures 8, 14-17 *; | [Y]US2013214423 (SADAKA MARIAM [US]) [Y] 4-8,16-20 * paragraphs [0033] , [0037] , [0038]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2009294814 (ASSEFA SOLOMON [US], et al) [X] 21,22,29-31 * paragraphs [0019] , [0039] - [0046]; figures 3, 5D * [I] 23,24; | [XI]US2008291767 (BARNES JOSEPH S [US], et al) [X] 21,22,25,27,29,31,37,38 * paragraphs [0070] , [0074] , [0075] , [0079] , [0080]; figures 8C, 8D * [I] 23,24; | [X]US2012193752 (PURUSHOTHAMAN SAMPATH [US], et al) [X] 21-33,37,38 * paragraphs [0010] , [0028] , [0035] , [0043] , [0046] , [0049]; figures 1, 2, 6, 8, 9, 12, 13 *; | [X]US2001005059 (KOYANAGI MITSUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 21,22,27,28,30,31,37,38 * paragraphs [0084] , [0093] , [0096]; figures 6, 10 * |