EP3124505 - ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN COPOLYMER AND LUBRICATING OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Katsuyoshi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Koji c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
MIZUKAWA, Tomoaki c/o PRIME POLYMER CO. LTD. 3 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 04 /
MATSUURA, Sadahiko c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 1-2 Waki 6-chome Wakicho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740-0061 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15767983.8 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP59487 | Priority number, date | JP20140068586 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014068586 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015147215 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3124505 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/6592, C10M107/02, C10M177/00, C10N20/00, C10N20/02, C10N20/04, C10N30/00, C10N30/02, C10N30/06, C10N40/04, C10N40/08, C10N40/25, C10N70/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F4/65908 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/65927 (KR,US);
C10M107/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10M107/06 (EP,US);
C10M107/10 (EP,US);
C10M177/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2500/03 (KR);
C08F2500/17 (KR);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0245 (US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/68 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65927 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/03 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025, C10N2020/02 (US,EP);
C10M2205/022, C10M2205/024 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | ETHYLEN/ALPHA-OLEFIN-COPOLYMER UND SCHMIERÖL | [2017/05] | English: | ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN COPOLYMER AND LUBRICATING OIL | [2017/05] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE D'ÉTHYLÈNE/ALPHA-OLÉFINE ET HUILE LUBRIFIANTE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2016 | Translation filed | 07.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 07.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 13.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0200351 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [IA]US5292845 (KAWASAKI MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [X]US2008171651 (TOHI YASUSHI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2008505932 (Exxonmobil Chemical Patents Inc.) [Y] 10-13, 24-27 * , claims 1 to 58; paragraphs [0001], [0020]; examples & JP 4988568 B & JP 5268087 B & US 2006/0009595 A1 & US 2006/0025545 A1 & US 2006/0293474 A1 & WO 2006/010139 A2 & EP 1765841 A1 & EP 1774485 A & DE 602005010255 D & CA 2576840 A & KR 10-2007-0039930 A & CN 101010705 A & CN 101124235 A *; | [A]JP2011001497 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-27 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011001489 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-27* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011219777 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-27 * , entire text & JP 2007-186664 A & US 2008/0085977 A1 & WO 2006/098452 A1 & EP 1860149 A1 & KR 10-2007-0112153 A & CN 101142272 A & AU 2006223826 A *; | [XY]JP2013177641 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-9, 14-23 * , claims 1 to 9; paragraphs [0001], [0017], [0030], [0046], [0053] to [0055], [0086] to [0092], [0131] to [0136]; examples & JP 2007-186665 A & US 2008/0085977 A1 & WO 2006/098452 A1 & EP 1860149 A1 & KR 10-2007-0112153 A & CN 101142272 A & AU 2006223826 A * [Y] 10-13, 24-27 |