EP3122375 - BREAST AND OVARIAN CANCER VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington through its Center for Commercialization 4311 11th Avenue NE Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105 / US | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DISIS, Mary, L. 17850 SE 192nd Drive Renton, WA 98058 / US | 02 /
CECIL, Denise 19224 15th Avenue NW Shoreline, WA 98177 / US | 03 /
SLOTA, Meredith c/o University of Washington 4545 Roosevelt Way NE Suite 400 Seattle, WA 98105 / US | [2017/08] |
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
DISIS, Mary, L. 17850 SE 192nd Drive Renton, WA 98058 / US | ||
02 /
CECIL, Denise 19224 15th Avenue NW Shoreline, WA 98177 / US | |||
03 /
SLOTA, Meredith 1711 25th Avenue Apt. 1 Seattle, WA 98122 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2017/05] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15768124.8 | 27.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015US23161 | Priority number, date | US201461972176P | 28.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461972176 P | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015149016 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3122375 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3122375 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K48/00, C12N15/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/001103 (EP,US);
A61K39/001106 (EP,US);
A61K39/001129 (EP,US);
A61K39/00115 (EP,US);
A61K39/001152 (EP,US);
A61P15/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (US);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K14/70567 (US);
C07K14/70596 (US);
C07K14/71 (US);
C12N15/62 (US);
C12N9/104 (EP,US);
C12Y203/02 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFUNGEN GEGEN BRUST- UND EIERSTOCKKREBS | [2017/05] | English: | BREAST AND OVARIAN CANCER VACCINES | [2017/05] | French: | VACCINS CONTRE LE CANCER DU SEIN ET DES OVAIRES | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2015 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | TR | 03.03.2021 | LU | 27.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
TR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | HR | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 03.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0050590 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO0102556 (MAX DELBRUECK CENTRUM [DE], et al); | [I]WO2008073660 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2007083334 (MINTZ LIAT [US], et al); | [XYA]US2009170767 (KARUMANCHI S ANANTH [US], et al); | [A]US2010150918 (KUFER PETER [DE], et al); | [A]US2011008347 (ULLRICH AXEL [DE], et al); | [A]US2012128584 (TOGASHI AKIRA [JP], et al); | [YA]US2012135033 (WALLECHA ANU [US]); | [A]US2013034566 (SHIBA YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | by applicant | US3625214 | US4270537 | US4469863 | US4596556 | US4789734 | US4790824 | US4886499 | US4897268 | US4906474 | US4925673 | US4940460 | US4941880 | US5015235 | US5034506 | US5064413 | US5075109 | US5141496 | US5190521 | US5216141 | US5235033 | US5312335 | US5328483 | US5334144 | US5339163 | US5383851 | US5386023 | US5417662 | US5466220 | US5480381 | US5503627 | US5520639 | US5527288 | US5569189 | US5599302 | US5602240 | WO9713537 | US5637684 | US5644048 | US5649912 | WO9737705 | US5704911 | US5811128 | US5814344 | US5820883 | US5853763 | US5893397 | WO9934850 | US5928647 | US5942252 | US5993412 | WO0050590 | WO0102556 | US2007083334 | WO2008073660 | US2009170767 | US2010150918 | US2011008347 | US2012128584 | US2012135033 | US2013034566 |