EP3123242 - EXTENDABLE CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THAKUR, Anshuman 8900 SW 149th Place Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15768303.8 | 02.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015US18334 | Priority number, date | US201414228623 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: US201414228623 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015148061 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123242 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/56 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,KR,US);
G03B17/561 (KR);
H04N23/57 (KR);
H04N23/60 (KR);
H04N23/695 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | AUSZIEHBARE KAMERA | [2017/05] | English: | EXTENDABLE CAMERA | [2017/05] | French: | CAMÉRA TÉLESCOPIQUE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 24.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09307801 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0024]; claims 1-2; and figures 1(a)-2(e). *; | [XY]JP2004229327 (KANESHIRO TOSHIO) [X] 1-3, 6-7, 9, 12-13 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0029], [0041]; claim 1; and figures 1(a)-1(d), 2(a), 5(a). * [Y] 4-5, 8, 10-11, 14-25; | [A]JP2006229276 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0032]-[0038]; claim 1; and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20080056789 (YUHO HITEC INC [KR]) [Y] 4-5, 8, 10-11, 14-25 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0030], [0039]-[0045]; claim 1; and figures 1, 5. *; | [A]KR101279624B (SEOUL METROPOLITAN GOVERNMENT [KR]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0022]; claim 1; and figures 1-2. * |