EP3122434 - FILTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asama Coldwater Manufacturing Inc. 180 Asama Parkway Coldwater, MI 49036 / US | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCVICKER, Kevin 180 Asama Parkway Coldwater, MI 49036 / US | 02 /
HEMKER, Tyler 180 Asama Parkway Coldwater, MI 49036 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15768368.1 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015US22667 | Priority number, date | US201461971267P | 27.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461971267 P | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015148766 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122434 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D24/02, B01D24/20, B01D24/22, B01D24/26, B01D39/06, B01D39/20, C10M175/00, F16N39/00, B01D35/06, B01D24/00, B23Q11/00, B01D24/16, B23Q11/10 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B01D24/02 (EP,US);
B01D24/002 (EP);
B01D24/165 (EP,US);
B01D35/06 (EP);
B01D39/06 (EP,US);
B23Q11/1069 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | B01D24/02, B01D24/20, B01D24/22, B01D24/26, B01D39/06, B01D39/20, C10M175/00, F16N39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | FILTRIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/05] | English: | FILTRATION SYSTEM | [2017/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 29.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3845971 (HAMILTON B) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3 ** column 2, lines 3-57 *; | [X]US4277280 (MONTGRAIN LUC) [X] 1-6,9,10 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 16 *; | [X]WO9916527 (XONEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, lines 5-19 * * page 6, line 5 - page 10, line 23 *; | [XI]US2009218268 (TASHIRO MINORU [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0029] - [0059]; figures 1-7 * [I] 12 | International search | [Y]US3793184 (LOFTUS T) [Y] 7-8, 15 * , col. 5, In. 21-28 *; | [XY]US4277280 (MONTGRAIN LUC) [X] 1-6, 9-10, 13-14 and 16- 17 * , Fig. 1, col. 4, In. 63 - col. 5, In. 14 * [Y] 7-8, 11-12, 15 and 18-20; | [Y]US4450002 (DURKEE RICHARD G [US]) [Y] 12 and 19-20 * , Figs. 1-3, col. 4, In. 48 - col. 5, In. 26 *; | [Y]US5766450 (HERMAN STEWART T [US], et al) [Y] 11 and 18 * , Fig. 4; col. 6, In. 39-52 *; | [A]US5904751 (VAN NIEKERK ERASMUS [FR]) [A] 1-20* , Figs. 4-6, col. 8, In. 56 - col. 9, In. 38 * |