EP3125475 - COMMUNICATION NODE, CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Longjiang c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Yoji c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
TAKASHIMA, Masanori c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 04 /
TORIGOE, Keisuke c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15769057.9 | 24.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP58852 | Priority number, date | JP20140062674 | 25.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014062674 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015146958 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125475 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/70, H04L12/46, H04L12/66 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H04L12/4641 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/1813 (US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSKNOTEN, STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2017/05] | English: | COMMUNICATION NODE, CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2017/05] | French: | NOEUD DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, MÉTHODE DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | Translation filed | 08.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003172188 (HASEGAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,14,16 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0067]; figures 4-11 * [I] 5-13,15,17; | [I]US2014006585 (DUNBAR LINDA [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2008112408 (FAN LINGYUAN [CN], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0060]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2013062070 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 7,8,12,13,15,17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 *; | [P]US2014289379 (YAMAGUCHI SYUUHEI [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 * | International search | [XYA]JP2003324462 (HITACHI CABLE) [X] 1-2, 4, 14, 16 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0032], [0042]; fig. 2, 6 & US 2003/0172188 A1 & CN 1441573 A & KR 10-2003-0071552 A & SG 134983 A * [Y] 3, 7-13, 15, 17 [A] 5-6; | [Y]US2008112408 (FAN LINGYUAN [CN], et al) [Y] 3, 10 * , paragraph [0045]; fig. 1 & WO 2007/009337 A1 & US 2011/0305243 A1 & EP 1906595 A1 & CN 1897568 A & AT 533261 T *; | [Y] - ISAO HORIKOSHI, "User Shiten de Ukibori ni suru SDN no Riso to Genjitsu", SDN Naradewa no Un'yo Know How ga Mieru Butsuri to Ronri no Taio Kanri ya MTU Chosei nado SDN Jirei File 2 NEC Biglobe, (20130901), pages 16 - 19, XP008185041 [Y] 7-13, 15, 17 |