EP3124526 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MICROPOROUS PLASTIC FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2017/41] |
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Toray Battery Separator Film Co., Ltd. 1190-13, Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHINOMIYA, Takashi c/o Toray Industries, Inc., Nasu plant 1190-13 Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | 02 /
SUGATA, Masami c/o Toray Industries, Inc., Nasu plant 1190-13 Iguchi Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | 01 /
ICHINOMIYA, Takashi c/o Toray Industries, Inc., Nasu plant 1190-13 Iguchi, Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGATA, Masami c/o Toray Industries, Inc., Nasu plant 1190-13 Iguchi, Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | |||
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
ICHINOMIYA, Takashi c/o Toray Battery Separator Film Co., Ltd. 1190-13 Iguchi, Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGATA, Masami c/o Toray Battery Separator Film Co., Ltd. 1190-13 Iguchi, Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2763 / JP | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15769115.5 | 10.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP57058 | Priority number, date | JP20140059504 | 24.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014059504 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015146580 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3124526 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/00, B29C48/34, B29C48/88 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
B29C48/9175 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0027 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/26 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/355 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/91 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,KR,US);
B29C55/143 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/406 (EP,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/491 (KR);
B29K2023/065 (KR,US);
B29K2105/041 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | B29C47/00, B29C47/34, B29C47/88, B29C55/14, C08J9/00, C08J9/26, B01D71/26, B01D67/00, H01M2/14, H01M2/16, // B29K23/00, B29K105/04 | ||
Former IPC [2017/05] | C08J9/00, B01D71/26, B29C47/34, B29C47/88, C08J9/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIKROPORÖSER KUNSTSTOFFFOLIE | [2017/05] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MICROPOROUS PLASTIC FILM | [2017/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM PLASTIQUE MICROPOREUX | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2016 | Translation filed | 27.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4076895 (THENO MARK HENRY); | [Y]WO9912722 (MIKKELSEN OEYSTEIN [US]); | [Y]EP1153969 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [JP]); | [XY]WO2010001722 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2012121188 (IDEMITSU UNITECH CO LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP4033246B ; | [A]JP2009190987 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [XA]JP2011526547 ; | [XA]JP2012500130 ; | [A]JP2013032545 (TORAY BATTERY SEPARATOR FILM); | [A]JP2013530261 |