EP3122184 - CLOMAZONE MICROCAPSULES, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/05] | CLOMAZONE COMPOSITION, ITS PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2021/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JIANGSU ROTAM CHEMISTRY CO., LTD No. 88, Rotam Road Economic & Technical Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215301 / CN | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRISTOW, James Timothy Unit 6 26/F Trend Centre 29 Cheung Lee Street, Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
WU, Yifan Unit 6 26/F Trend Centre 29 Cheung Lee Street, Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co 63 Lemon Street Truro, Cornwall TR1 2PN / GB | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15769881.2 | 05.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015CN73674 | Priority number, date | GB20140005412 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: GB 201405412 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015143974 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122184 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3122184 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/28, A01N43/80, A01P13/02 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
A01N25/28 (EP,GB);
A01N43/80 (GB)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/28, A01N43/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CLOMAZONMIKROKAPSELN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2021/19] | English: | CLOMAZONE MICROCAPSULES, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE | [2021/19] | French: | MICROCAPSULES DE CLOMAZONE, LEURS PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION | [2021/19] |
Former [2017/05] | CLOMAZONZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2017/05] | CLOMAZONE COMPOSITION, ITS PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2017/05] | COMPOSITION DE CLOMAZONE, SA PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 10.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2015 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | GB | 05.03.2022 | IE | 05.03.2022 | LU | 05.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 05.03.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 05.03.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 05.03.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 05.03.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 05.03.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
GB | 05.03.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013105107 (SAHAH DIEPAK [IN]) [X] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * page 10; example 5 * * page 6, lines 11-12 * [Y] 7; | [XY]CN102669115 (UNITED BIO SHANGHAI AND SHANGHAI PHARMACEUTICAL XIAYI CO LTD) [X] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025]; examples 1-5; claim 7 * [Y] 7; | [XY]US2012157315 (CASANA GINER VICTOR [ES], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-12,14,15 * paragraph [0014]; claims 4-5 * * paragraphs [0227] , [ 230]; examples 3, 4 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2012245027 (CASANA GINER VICTOR [AT], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0006] , [ 261] - [0265]; example 9 * | [XY] - YAN-RUI GE ET AL, "Study on pre-polymerization condition of clomazone herbicide microcapsules by in-situ polymerization", JOURNAL OF HEBEI UNIVERSITY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (20100401), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:http://xuebao.hebust.edu.cn/hbkjdxen/ch/reader/create_pdf.aspx?file_no=20100216&year_id=2010&quarter_id=2&falg=1, pages 160 - 164, XP055388962 [X] 1-5,8-13 * page 161, paragraph 1. * [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://xuebao.hebust.edu.cn/hbkjdxen/ch/reader/create_pdf.aspx?file_no=20100216&year_id=2010&quarter_id=2&falg=1 | [XY] - Ge ET AL, "Preparation of the Microcapsule Agent of Clomazone Urea- formaldehyde Resin", Journal of Auhui Agricultural Sciences, (20100430), pages 12181 - 12183, URL: http://jglobal.jst.go.jp/public/201602299353749023, (20151111), XP055227540 [X] 1-5,8-13 * page 12181 - page 12182; figure 1; table 1 * [Y] 7 | International search | [X] - GE, YANRUI et al., "Preparation of the Microcapsule Agent of Clomazone Urea- formaldehyde Resin", Journal of Auhui Agricultural Sciences, (20100430), vol. 38, no. 22, pages 12181 - 12183, XP 055227540 [X] 1-3, 6-9, 13- 15, 20-23, 26 | [Y] - GE, YANRUI et al., "Preparation of the Microcapsule Agent of Clomazone Urea- formaldehyde Resin", Journal of Auhui Agricultural Sciences, (20100430), vol. 38, pages 12181 - 12183, XP 055227540 [Y] 4-5, 10-12, 16-19, 24-25 | [Y] - LIU, WENGUANG, "Microcapsule Suspensions", Modern Pesticide Formulations and Processing Technologies, XP008185350 [Y] 4-5, 10-12, 16-19, 24-25 |