Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3189494
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.09.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
03.06.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.12.2017 |
First examination report |
|
10.11.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
10.11.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
13.10.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
15.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
15.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
26.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
16.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
11.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|