EP3177633 - PROCESS FOR THE MODIFICATION OF A GLYCOPROTEIN USING A BETA-(1,4)-N-ACETYLGALACTOSAMINYLTRANSFERASE OR A MUTANT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/24] | PROCESS FOR THE MODIFICATION OF A GLYCOPROTEIN USING A ETA-(1,4)-N-ACETYLGALACTOSAMINYLTRANSFERASE OR A MUTANT THEREOF | ||
[2022/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SynAffix B.V. Pivot Park, RE-Building Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASIEL, Anna Agnieszka Donaudreef 78 3581 EN Utrecht / NL | 02 /
VAN DELFT, Floris Louis Bandoengstraat 13 NL-6524 KZ Nijmegen / NL | 03 /
VAN BERKEL, Sander Sebastiaan Rolling Stonesstraat 145 NL-6663 HR Lent / NL | [2017/25] |
Former [2017/24] | 01 /
WASIEL, Anna Agnieska Donaudreef 78 3581 EN Utrecht / NL | ||
02 /
VAN DELFT, Floris Louis Bandoengstraat 13 NL-6524 KZ Nijmegen / NL | |||
03 /
VAN BERKEL, Sander Sebastiaan Rolling Stonesstraat 145 NL-6663 HR Lent / NL | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15770973.4 | 04.08.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015NL50567 | Priority number, date | EP20140179713 | 04.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14179713 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016022027 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3177633 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3177633 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/10, C12P21/00, C12N9/10, C07K16/32 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
C12P21/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07H19/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/1051 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y204/01 (EP,US);
C12Y204/01038 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | C07H19/10, C07K16/00, C12P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG EINES GLYCOPROTEINS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER BETA-(1,4)-ACETYLGALACTOSAMINYLTRANSFERASE ODER EINES MUTANTEN DAVON | [2017/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MODIFICATION OF A GLYCOPROTEIN USING A BETA-(1,4)-N-ACETYLGALACTOSAMINYLTRANSFERASE OR A MUTANT THEREOF | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA MODIFICATION D'UNE GLYCOPROTÉINE À L'AIDE D'UNE BÊTA-(1,4)-N-ACÉTYLGALACTOSAMINYL-TRANSFÉRASE OU D'UN MUTANT CORRESPONDANT | [2017/24] |
Former [2017/24] | PROCESS FOR THE MODIFICATION OF A GLYCOPROTEIN USING A ETA-(1,4)-N-ACETYLGALACTOSAMINYLTRANSFERASE OR A MUTANT THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 17.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 28.11.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22185788.1 / EP4148138 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2015 | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | CY | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | ES | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | MK | 20.07.2022 | MT | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | PL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SE | 20.07.2022 | SI | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | TR | 20.07.2022 | IE | 04.08.2022 | LU | 04.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
TR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
TR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2014065661 (SYNAFFIX BV [NL]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * page 19 - page 20 * * page 25 - page 28 * * figures 4,14 *[A] 6,9; | [XDA] - BRIAN M. ZEGLIS ET AL, "Enzyme-Mediated Methodology for the Site-Specific Radiolabeling of Antibodies Based on Catalyst-Free Click Chemistry", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20130619), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1021/bc400122c, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 1057 - 1067, XP055101895 [XD] 1-5,7,8,10-16 * scheme 1, 2 * [A] 6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc400122c | [XDA] - CLARK P M ET AL, "Direct in-gel fluorescence detection and cellular imaging of O-GlcNAc-modified proteins", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 130, no. 35, doi:10.1021/JA8030467, ISSN 0002-7863, (20080903), pages 11576 - 11577, (20080807), XP002723745 [XD] 1-5,7,8,10-16 * figure 1 * [A] 6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja8030467 | by applicant | WO2007095506 | WO2008029281 | WO2013037824 | WO2014065661 | WO2015057063 | WO2015112013 | - MILLER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHERN., (2008), vol. 283, page 1985 | - KAWAR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHERN., (2002), vol. 277, page 34924 | - HOSKINS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 316, page 1625 | - VADAIE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, page 33501 | - RAMAKRISHNAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 23, page 20833 | - KHIDEKEL ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, page 16162 | - CLARK ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, page 11576 | - RAMAKRISHNAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 43, page 12513 | - MERCER ET AL., BIOCONJ. CHEM., (2013), vol. 24, page 144 | - BERTOZZI ET AL., ACS CHEM. BIOL., (2009), vol. 4, page 1068 | - BURNHAM-MARUSICH ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, page E49020 | - KAWAR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, page 34924 | - TARON ET AL., CARBOHYDR. RES., (2012), vol. 362, page 62 | - CARILLO, H.; LIPMAN, D., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL, S. ET AL., BLAST Manual, NCBI NLM NIH BETHESDA | - ALTSCHUL, S. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - HENTIKOFF; HENTIKOFF, "Comparison matrix: BLOSSUM62", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - WONG ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2011), vol. 111, page 4259 | - TARENTINO ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 5, page 599 | - COLLIN ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, page 3046 | - KANDA ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 17, pages 104 - 118 | - LINHARDT ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2012), vol. 77, pages 1449 - 1456 | - BAISCH ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 5, pages 383 - 391 | - KISO ET AL., GLYCOCONJ. J., (2006), vol. 23, page 565 | - RADEMANN ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2012), vol. 51, pages 9441 - 9447 | - WU ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 21, pages 723 - 733 | - R&D SYSTEMS, (20140731), URL: http://www.rndsystems.com/Products/EA001 | - POUILLY ET AL., ACS CHEM. BIOL., (2012), vol. 7, page 753 | - GUAN ET AL., CHEM. EUR. J., (2010), vol. 16, page 13343 | - HOSZTAFI ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA,, (1996), vol. 79, pages 133 - 136 | - QASBA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 20833 - 20839 | - QASBA ET AL., PROT. EXPR. PUR., (2003), vol. 30, pages 219 - 76229 |