Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10563437 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2020 | B2 | US2017292297 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202014010524 | 18.09.2014 | WO2015EP71142 | 15.09.2015 | DE102015104545 | 25.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107075887B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2020 | B | CN107075887 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE202014010524 | 18.09.2014 | WO2015EP71142 | 15.09.2015 | DE102015104545 | 25.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3194696 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2022 | B1 | EP3194696 | 26.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202014010524 | 18.09.2014 | WO2015EP71142 | 15.09.2015 | DE102015104545 | 25.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112015004237 | 06.07.2017 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE202014010524 | 18.09.2014 | WO2015EP71142 | 15.09.2015 | DE102015104545 | 25.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202014010524U | 26.02.2016 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202014010524 | 18.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016041996 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202014010524 | 18.09.2014 | DE102015104545 | 25.03.2015 |