EP3175028 - SPUNBOND POLYCARBONATE RESIN FILTER MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERS, Richard 305 Smith Road Hinsdale, MA 01235 / US | 02 /
COURTECUISSE, Francois Guillaume Sebastien Potterstraat 37b 4611 NH Bergen op Zoom / NL | 03 /
LEVASALMI, Juha-Matti 11 Bain Drive Delmar, NY 12054 / US | 04 /
LUCAS, Richard Zilverplevier 19 4617 KR Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Elzaburu S.L.P. C/ Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15771246.4 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015IB55788 | Priority number, date | US201462030849P | 30.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462030849 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016016848 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175028 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/011, D04H3/016, D04H3/018, D01F8/06, D01F8/14, D04H3/11 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
D04H3/011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D04H3/016 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D39/163 (US);
B01D39/1623 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D01D4/025 (US);
D01D5/0985 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D01F8/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D04H3/007 (CN);
D04H3/018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D04H3/11 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2239/0216 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D2239/0225 (US);
B01D2239/0627 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | SPINNVLIESPOLYCARBONATHARZFILTERMEDIEN | [2017/23] | English: | SPUNBOND POLYCARBONATE RESIN FILTER MEDIA | [2017/23] | French: | MILIEU FILTRANT À BASE DE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE FILÉE-LIÉE | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0814188 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3; claims 1,4-6 *; | [XY]WO9803710 (FIBERWEB NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, lines 18-22; figures 1,2; claims 1,8,9 * * page 7, lines 6-25, 28-33 * * page 9, lines 7-11 * [Y] 2-20; | [X]US6815382 (GROTEN ROBERT [FR], et al) [X] 1* example 1 *; | [Y]JP2009084737 (DAIWA SPINNING CO LTD, et al) [Y] 2-20 * paragraphs [0060] , [0 75] , [0 50] , [0 78] , [0 25]; claims 9,1,4 * | Examination | - J.A. Brydson, Plastic materilals, Butterworth-Heinemann, (19991231), page 564, ISBN 978-0-7506-4132-6 | by applicant | US3276944 | US3338992 | US3341394 | US3502538 | US3502763 | US3542615 | US3692618 | US3849241 | US4340563 | US7316723 | US7786246 |