EP3197838 - ANAMMOX PROCESS AT WASTE WATER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support 1 Place Montgolfier Immeuble L'Aquarène 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSSON, Magnus Ferievägen 5 224 67 Lomma / SE | 02 /
WELANDER, Thomas Ljunggatan 25B 244 65 Furulund / SE | 03 /
PICULELL, Maria Nobelvägen 58 lgh 1203 214 33 Malmö / SE | [2020/02] |
Former [2017/31] | 01 /
CHRISTENSSON, Magnus Ferievägen 5 S-224 67 Lomma / SE | ||
02 /
WELANDER, Thomas Ljunggatan 25B S-244 65 Furulund / SE | |||
03 /
PICULELL, Maria Nobelvägen 58 lgh 1203 S-214 33 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2017/31] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15771911.3 | 24.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015EP72008 | Priority number, date | SE20140051128 | 24.09.2014 Original published format: SE 1451128 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046330 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197838 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3197838 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/30, C02F3/10, C02F11/04, C02F101/16 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
C02F3/307 (EP,US);
C02F11/04 (EP,US);
C02F3/08 (US);
C02F3/121 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
C02F2209/14 (EP,US);
C02F2301/08 (EP,US);
C02F2301/10 (EP,US);
C02F3/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANAMMOX-PROZESS EINER KLÄRANLAGE | [2017/31] | English: | ANAMMOX PROCESS AT WASTE WATER PLANT | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ANAMMOX DANS UNE STATION D'ÉPURATION D'EAUX USÉES | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 05.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2015 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 24.09.2020 | LU | 24.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 24.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.09.2015 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 24.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 24.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | LT | 08.01.2020 | |
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | LT | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2013084972 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [ID]WO2013151836 (VEOLIA WATER SOLUTIONS & TECH [FR], et al) [ID] 1-18 * figures 1,2 * * page 7, line 10 - page 14, line 24 * * page 18, line 23 - line 29 *; | [A] - CHRISTIAN FUX ET AL, "Biological treatment of ammonium-rich wastewater by partial nitritation and subsequent anaerobic ammonium oxidation (anammox) in a pilot plant", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20021113), vol. 99, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0168-1656(02)00220-1, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 295 - 306, XP055121402 [A] 1-18 * page 296 - page 298 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(02)00220-1 | by applicant | WO2013151836 | - PUSKER REGMI, "NOB Repression for Mainstream Nitrite-Shunt and Deammonijication: A Pilot Study", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WATER ENVIRONMENT FEDERATION, WEFTEC 2013: SESSION 26 THROUGH SESSION, vol. 34, no. 23, pages 1959 - 1981 |