|
28.08.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.08.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.11.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
17.01.2017 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
17.01.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
14.03.2016 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.03.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
14.03.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
8 |