EP3127068 - AUGMENTED PRE-PAID CARDS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soon-Shiong, Patrick 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, California 90232 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15772231.5 | 02.04.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US24154 | Priority number, date | US201414243833 | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US201414243833 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153914 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127068 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/28, G06Q20/34, G06Q20/12, G06Q30/02 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0253 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/356 (KR);
G06Q20/28 (KR);
G06Q20/342 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/0276 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | G06Q20/28, G06Q20/34, G06Q20/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | ERWEITERTE VORAUSBEZAHLTE KARTEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2017/06] | English: | AUGMENTED PRE-PAID CARDS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2017/06] | French: | CARTES PRÉPAYÉES AUGMENTÉES, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 27.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 23.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/18] | 21.12.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014076965 (BECOREST WILLIAM [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]US8606645 (APPLEFELD NEAL [US]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2013126221 (NANT HOLDINGS IP LLC [US]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2013024371 (HARIRAMANI PRAKASH [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0101]-[0119], [0168]-[0172], [0360]-[0363]; and figures 1A-5B, 10, 14A-14B, 61. *; | [Y]US2010246969 (WINDER SIMON A J [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0040]; and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]US2011055049 (HARPER ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 6-9, 25-26, 28 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0043]; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2013204739 (FRIEDMAN MORRIS [US]) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0037]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2003004997 (PARKER STEVEN [CA], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0064]; and figures 11-12. * |