Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10328062 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2019 | B2 | US2017182016 | 29.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US24306 | 03.04.2015 | US201461975487 | 04.04.2014 | US201461993871 | 15.05.2014 | US201515300690 | 03.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3126520 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2021 | B1 | EP3126520 | 21.02.2018 | A4 | EP3126520 | 08.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US24306 | 03.04.2015 | US201461975487 | 04.04.2014 | US201461993871 | 15.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015154005 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461975487 | 04.04.2014 | US201461993871 | 15.05.2014 |