EP3126429 - METHODS FOR MAKING LIGNOCELLULOSE COMPOSITE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific Chemicals LLC 133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30303 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNIADY, Adam K. 4015 Embassy Way Lilburn, Georgia 30047 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Bobby L. 1637 Brentwood Crossing S.E. Conyers, Georgia 30013 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Modet y Cía., S.L. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15772802.3 | 30.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US23438 | Priority number, date | US201461974145P | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461974145 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153517 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126429 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/40, C08F2/44, C08F4/70, C08L97/02, C08K5/14, C08L23/00, C08L33/06, C08L71/00 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
B27N3/00 (EP,US);
B27N3/002 (EP,US);
C08L3/06 (US);
C08L63/04 (US);
B27N1/02 (EP,US);
C08L61/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L61/06 (EP,US);
C08L97/02, C08L63/04 (US,EP);
C08L97/02, C08L97/005 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LIGNOCELLULOSEVERBUNDPRODUKTEN | [2017/06] | English: | METHODS FOR MAKING LIGNOCELLULOSE COMPOSITE PRODUCTS | [2017/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS COMPOSITES LIGNOCELLULOSIQUES | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 29.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6291558 (RASKIN MIKHAIL [US], et al) [X] 1,8,16,20 * column 3, lines 13-17; example 16 * [Y] 2-7,9-15,17-19; | [Y]US2005011621 (WESTERMARK ULLA [SE], et al) [Y] 2-7,9-15,17-19* the whole document * | International search | [A]US6113729 (CHIU SHUI-TUNG [CA]) [A] 1-20* See examples 1-3; claims 1-16; and Tables 1-3. *; | [A]US2002065400 (RASKIN MIKHAIL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0050]; examples 1, 2 and 13; claims 1-47; and Tables 13 and 14. *; | [A]US2005011621 (WESTERMARK ULLA [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0044]; claims 1-20; and Tables 1-3. *; | [A]US2012073228 (FORK FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0035]; and claims 1-19. *; | [A]US2013240114 (BALOGH JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0066] and [0109]: and claims 1-20. * |