EP3126460 - COPPER OXIDE INFRARED PIGMENTS, METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND PAINTS COMPRISING THE PIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/06] | COPPER OXIDE INFRARED PIGMENT | ||
[2019/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferro Corporation 6060 Parkland Boulevard, Suite 250 Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLIKEN, Elena D. 5570 Florida Avenue Bethel Park, PA 15102 / US | 02 /
DETRIE, Terry J. 1105 Red Tail Hollow Washington, PA 15301 / US | 03 /
SAKOSKE, George E. 5000 Lake Charles Drive Independence, OH 44131 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15772824.7 | 19.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US21373 | Priority number, date | US201461974017P | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461974017 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153129 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126460 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3126460 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/33, C09B67/04, C09B67/48, C09D5/32, C09D17/00, C09C1/00, C01G3/02, C08K3/22, B82Y30/00, C09C3/04, C09D7/61, C09D7/40 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G3/02 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C09C1/00 (EP,US);
C09C3/041 (US);
C09C3/043 (US);
C09D17/007 (US);
C09D5/004 (US);
C09D5/32 (EP,US);
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
C01P2002/60 (US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/62 (US);
C08K2003/2248 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | C09D5/33, C09B67/04, C09B67/48, C01G3/02, C08K3/22, B82Y30/00, C09C3/04, C09D5/32, C09D7/12, C09D17/00, C09C1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2017/06] | C09D5/33, C09B67/04, C09B67/48, C01G3/02, C08K3/22, B82Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPFEROXID-INFRAROTPIGMENTE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ANSTRICHE, DIE DIE PIGMENTE ENTHALTEN | [2019/25] | English: | COPPER OXIDE INFRARED PIGMENTS, METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND PAINTS COMPRISING THE PIGMENTS | [2019/25] | French: | PIGMENTS INFRAROUGE À BASE D'OXYDE DE CUIVRE, PROCEDES POUR LEUR PRODUCTION ET PAINTURES COMPRENANT LES PIGMENTS | [2019/25] |
Former [2017/06] | KUPFEROXID-INFRAROTPIGMENT | ||
Former [2017/06] | COPPER OXIDE INFRARED PIGMENT | ||
Former [2017/06] | PIGMENT INFRAROUGE À BASE D'OXYDE DE CUIVRE | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2015 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | IE | 19.03.2020 | LU | 19.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 19.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2006042129 (PHIBRO TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 10-15 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0110] * * paragraph [0116] * [A] 1-9; | [YA]JP2010150354 (TODA KOGYO CORP) [Y] 10-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0045] * * examples 1,2 *[A] 1-9; | [YA]WO2013047332 (DOWA ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-15 * column 3, lines 10-17 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 40 * * column 9, line 4 - column 10, line 67; table 1 * [A] 1-9; | [YA]US2014057112 (LANG WEI [US]) [Y] 10-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] * * paragraph [0059] * [A] 1-9 | International search | [A]WO9731054 (AMERICAN CHEMET CORP [US]) [A] 1 -24; | [A]JP2011057501 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA)[A] 1 -24; | [A]JP2012201515 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1 -24 |