EP3127892 - SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING AROMATIC COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Engineering, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-Chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | [2018/36] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIMOTO, Akiyori c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
HIRAYAMA, Haruaki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yukio c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIOKA, Hiroshi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15772991.4 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015JP59330 | Priority number, date | JP20140072579 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014072579 | [2017/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015151992 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127892 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/76, C07C15/04, C07C15/06, C07C15/08, C07C15/24, C01B3/02, C01B3/34, C01C1/04 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
C07C2/76 (EP,RU,US);
C01B3/025 (EP,RU,US);
B01J8/00 (US);
C01B3/34 (EP,RU,US);
C01B3/36 (RU,US);
C01C1/0405 (RU,US);
C01C1/0476 (US);
C01C1/0488 (EP,RU,US);
C01B2203/0205 (US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/025 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/043 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0445 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/061 (US);
C01B2203/062 (US);
C01B2203/068 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0844 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
C01B2203/127 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1288 (EP,US);
C01B2203/142 (EP,US);
C01B2203/148 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/76, C07C15/04 (EP,US);
C07C2/76, C07C15/06 (US,EP);
C07C2/76, C07C15/08 (US,EP);
C07C2/76, C07C15/24 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/06] | C07C2/76, C07C15/04, C07C15/06, C07C15/08, C07C15/24, C01B3/02, C01C1/02, C01C1/04, C07B61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AROMATISCHEN VERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/06] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING AROMATIC COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2017/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSÉ AROMATIQUE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2016 | Translation filed | 26.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 26.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011288355 (OGAWA YUJI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH06234517 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP); | [YA]JP2007099748 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]WO2010092849 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) |