EP3126038 - CONVERSION OF GAS AND TREATMENT OF A SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mangrove Water Technologies Ltd. 216 - 3800 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver, BC V6S 2L9 / CA | [2021/14] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states The University of British Columbia University - Industry Liaison Office 103 - 6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, BC V6T 1Z3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINSON, David 1391 Coleman Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7K 1W4 / CA | 02 /
BONAKDARPOUR, Arman 1295 Richards Street Apt. 1708 Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 1B7 / CA | 03 /
LAM, Alfred 1978 Vine Street Unit 309 Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 4S1 / CA | 04 /
DARA, Mohammad Saad 1923 Chesterfield Avenue North Vancouver, British Columbia V7M 2P4 / CA | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15773002.9 | 02.04.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015CA50273 | Priority number, date | US201461974280P | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461974280 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015149185 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126038 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3126038 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/24, B01D61/42, B01D61/46, C02F1/469, C25B1/04, C02F1/44, B01D53/32, B01D53/14, B01D61/54, C02F1/461, C02F103/18, C02F103/08 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
B01D53/326 (EP,US);
B01D61/422 (EP,US);
B01D61/46 (EP,US);
B01D61/462 (EP);
B01D61/463 (EP);
B01D61/54 (EP,US);
C02F1/4693 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
B01D2251/304 (EP,US);
B01D2251/604 (EP,US);
B01D2252/103 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20 (EP,US);
B01D2252/602 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2256/24 (EP,US);
B01D2257/302 (EP,US);
B01D2257/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2311/18 (EP,US);
B01D2311/246 (EP,US);
B01D53/1456 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46142 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4613 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46135 (EP,US);
C02F2209/003 (EP,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02P20/151 (US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | B01D61/24, B01D61/42, B01D61/46, C02F1/469, C25B1/04, C02F1/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMWANDLUNG VON GAS UND BEHANDLUNG EINER LÖSUNG | [2017/06] | English: | CONVERSION OF GAS AND TREATMENT OF A SOLUTION | [2017/06] | French: | CONVERSION DE GAZ ET TRAITEMENT D'UNE SOLUTION | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 02.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2020 | 21.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21177167.0 / EP3892362 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2015 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | IT | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | MT | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.04.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.04.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.04.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0286143 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [XI]WO2010009273 (CALERA CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2010087823 (CALERA CORP [US], et al); | [XI]US2010200419 (GILLIAM RYAN J [US], et al) | International search | [A]EP0286143 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]WO2004070377 (DIONEX CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2010009273 (CALERA CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0286143 | WO2004070377 | WO2010009273 | US7727374 | WO2010087823 | US2010200419 | WO2012085552 |