Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11318416 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2022 | B2 | US2017014758 | 19.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | US201515301241 | 02.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3892362 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | EP15773002 | 02.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115569524 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201580018398 | 02.04.2015 | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106163642 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2944523 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2024 | C | CA2944523 | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3126038 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B1 | EP3126038 | 22.11.2017 | A4 | EP3126038 | 08.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3126038T | 11.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CA50273 | 02.04.2015 | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | EP15773002 | 02.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015149185 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461974280 | 02.04.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3892362 |