EP3127118 - DISTRIBUTED VIDEO PROCESSING AND SELECTIVE VIDEO UPLOAD IN A CLOUD ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GoPro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way, Building E San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEVERT, Otto K. c/o Gopro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way, Bldg. E San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 02 /
OSBORNE, Paul D. c/o Gopro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way, Bldg. E San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 03 /
DUDAS, David c/o Gopro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way, Bldg. E San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 04 /
YOUEL, Jeffrey S. c/o Gopro, Inc. 3000 Clearview Way, Bldg. E San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15773596.0 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US23680 | Priority number, date | US201461973131P | 31.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461973131 P | US201462039849P | 20.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462039849 P | US201562099985P | 05.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562099985 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015153667 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3127118 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2743, G11B27/02, H04N21/4402, H04N21/442, H04N21/472, H04N21/4223, H04N21/6543, H04N21/6547, H04N5/232, H04L29/06, // H04N19/46, H04N19/164, H04N19/17, H04N19/40 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G11B27/30 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04N19/164 (US);
H04N19/17 (EP,US);
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N21/2743 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/440263 (EP,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,US);
H04N21/47205 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/6547 (EP,US);
H04N23/6811 (EP,US);
H04N19/162 (EP,US);
H04N19/59 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | G11B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE VIDEOVERARBEITUNG UND SELEKTIVES HOCHLADEN VON VIDEOS IN EINER CLOUD-UMGEBUNG | [2017/06] | English: | DISTRIBUTED VIDEO PROCESSING AND SELECTIVE VIDEO UPLOAD IN A CLOUD ENVIRONMENT | [2017/06] | French: | TRAITEMENT VIDÉO DISTRIBUÉ ET TÉLÉCHARGEMENT DE VIDÉO SÉLECTIF DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT EN NUAGE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 26.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008123976 (COOMBS KEVIN [GB], et al) [I] 1,9* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]FR2933226 (AUVITEC POST PRODUCTION [FR]) [I] 1,2,9,10 * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 35 * * page 14, line 24 - line 31 * * page 15, line 24 - page 17, line 4 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US2011206351 (GIVOLY TAL [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] - [0040] , [0 43] , [0054] , [0057] - [0058] - [0060] , [0064] , [0081] , [0084] , [0086] , [0089] - [0093] - [0099]; figure 1 *; | [XPI]US8768142 (JU CHI HONG JOHN [US], et al) [XP] 1,9 * figures 1,2,3 * * column 2, line 54 - line 62 * * column 5, line 9 - line 26 * * column 5, line 59 - line 67 * * column 6, line 2 - line 9 * * column 6, line 20 - line 21 * [I] 2,10 | International search | [Y]US2005025454 (NAKAMURA NOBUO [JP], et al) [Y] 2-3, 13-14 * entire document *; | [Y]US2008123976 (COOMBS KEVIN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2010086216 (LEE JAEJOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2010318660 (BALASUBRAMANIAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [Y] 7-10, 18-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011206351 (GIVOLY TAL [US]) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012027381 (KATAOKA HIDEO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-5, 15-16 * entire document * |