EP3127117 - DATA READOUT DEVICE FOR READING OUT DATA FROM A DATA CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEND, Robert Luisenstrasse 25 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
BRUDER, Ingmar Am Dreschplatz 12 67271 Neuleiningen / DE | 03 /
IRLE, Stephan Theodorstrasse 13 57074 Siegen / DE | 04 /
THIEL, Erwin Schöntalstrasse 4 57076 Siegen / DE | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 15773745.3 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015IB52233 | Priority number, date | EP20140162683 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14162683 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015150989 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127117 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
G11B7/13 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1362 (US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENAUSLESEVORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSLESEN VON DATEN AUS EINEM DATENTRÄGER | [2017/06] | English: | DATA READOUT DEVICE FOR READING OUT DATA FROM A DATA CARRIER | [2017/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE DONNÉES POUR LIRE DES DONNÉES À PARTIR D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNÉES | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 18.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011103215 (HOTTA TOHRU [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0050] *; | [A]US2012063287 (YAMAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009046543 (DE HOOG THOMAS JAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |