EP3127662 - INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBORI, Yuji c/o Sony EMCS Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15773947.5 | 03.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015JP01113 | Priority number, date | JP20140074153 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014074153 | [2017/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015151402 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127662 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3127662 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/08 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B25J9/0009 (EP,US);
B25J15/0028 (US);
B23P21/00 (EP,US);
B25J15/0052 (US);
B25J15/0293 (EP,US);
B25J15/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUSTRIEROBOTER | [2017/06] | English: | INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | [2017/06] | French: | ROBOT INDUSTRIEL | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2015 | Translation filed | 23.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 23.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2015 | AL | 13.01.2021 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | DK | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | ES | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | IT | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | NL | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SE | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | TR | 13.01.2021 | IE | 03.03.2021 | LU | 03.03.2021 | FR | 13.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | GB | 13.04.2021 | NO | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.03.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 03.03.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 03.03.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 03.03.2021 | ||
FR | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH0395018 (TOHOKU MUNEKATA KK) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5; | [X]JPH05285876 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,5* paragraph [0022]; figure - *; | [XI]JPH08172297 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] - [0024]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5 | International search | [A]JPS5974079U (Tokyo Shibaura Electric Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6150790 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS61164791 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6288721 (SEIBU DENKI KOGYO KK, et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5004401 A & US 5163808 A & EP 219780 A2 *; | [A]JPH0395018 (TOHOKU MUNEKATA KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0560785U (Koganei Corp.) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH08172297 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09295293 (NEW ERAA KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000108070 (NEW ERAA KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000271892 (SMC CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]DE102008026506 (SCHMALZ J GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |