EP3204331 - PRODUCTION OF LOW PRESSURE LIQUID CARBON DIOXIDE FROM A POWER PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 8 Rivers Capital, LLC 406 Blackwell Street, 4th Floor Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLAM, Rodney John Lanhill House Lanhill Chippenham Wiltshire SN14 6LY / GB | 02 /
FORREST, Brock Alan 2113 Englewood Avenue DN Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US | 03 /
FETVEDT, Jeremy Eron 4805 Dundee Place Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 15774742.9 | 03.09.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US48340 | Priority number, date | US201462047744P | 09.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462047744 P | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016040108 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204331 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3204331 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/50, B01D53/62, C01B32/60, F01K13/00, F01K25/10, F02C1/08, F02C3/34, F02C7/143, F23J15/02, F23L7/00, F17C9/04 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
F25J1/0027 (EP);
C01B32/50 (EP,KR,US);
F01K13/00 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B01D53/62 (EA);
F02C6/04 (CN,KR,US);
B01D53/002 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/265 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/60 (EP,US);
F01K13/02 (KR);
F01K25/10 (EA);
F01K25/103 (EP,KR,US);
F02C1/08 (EA,US);
F02C3/34 (EA,US);
F02C7/143 (EA);
F17C9/04 (EA);
F23J15/02 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
F23L7/00 (EA,KR);
F23L7/007 (EP,CN,US);
F25J1/004 (EP);
F25J1/0045 (EP);
F25J1/0202 (EP);
F25J1/0292 (EP);
F25J3/04018 (EP,US);
F25J3/04533 (EP,US);
F25J3/04618 (EP,US);
B01D2256/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
F23J2215/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F23J2900/15061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F25J2215/80 (US);
F25J2220/82 (EP);
F25J2230/06 (EP,US);
F25J2235/80 (EP);
F25J2240/70 (EP,US);
F25J2260/80 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | 13.03.2017 | ME | 13.03.2017 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM KOHLENDIOXID MIT NIEDRIGEM DRUCK AUS EINEM STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2017/33] | English: | PRODUCTION OF LOW PRESSURE LIQUID CARBON DIOXIDE FROM A POWER PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2017/33] | French: | PRODUCTION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE LIQUIDE À BASSE PRESSION À PARTIR D'UN SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 13.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18188446.1 / EP3438049 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2015 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | IE | 03.09.2018 | LU | 03.09.2018 | MT | 03.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 03.09.2015 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4498289 (OSGERBY IAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [AD]US2012237881 (ALLAM RODNEY JOHN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-20 * claim 10 * * the whole document *; | [XI]US2012285195 (CONSONNI STEFANO [IT], et al) [X] 21 * paragraphs [0147] - [0152] * * the whole document *[I] 22-29; | [AD]US2013104525 (ALLAM RODNEY JOHN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-20 * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [XDAI]US2013213049 (ALLAM RODNEY JOHN [GB], et al) [XD] 21 * paragraph [0310]; claim 1 * * the whole document * [A] 1-20 [I] 22-29 | by applicant | US2010300063 | US2012067054 | US2012237881 | US2013104525 | US2013213049 | US8596075 | US8776532 | US8959887 | US8986002 | US9068743 |