EP3192277 - HEARING INSTRUMENT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG | [2018/08] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent, No 06-08 Singapore 139959 / SG | ||
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Sivantes Pte. Ltd. Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08 Singapore 139959 / SG | ||
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd. Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08 Singapore 139959 / SG | ||
For all designated states Beyfuss, Stefanie Haselhofstr. 47 91058 Erlangen / DE | |||
For all designated states Flaig, Uwe Sudetendeutsche Straße 98 90537 Feucht / DE | |||
For all designated states Ganapathy, Anand 711 Jurong West Street 71 10-21 Singapore 640711 / SG | |||
For all designated states Naumann, Frank Schönbacher Str. 30 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | |||
For all designated states Rass, Uwe Gleisshammerstr. 132 90480 Nürnberg / DE | |||
For all designated states Ler, Gee Heng Holland Avenue Block 12 Singapore 272012 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEYFUSS, Stefanie Haselhofstr. 47 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
FLAIG, Uwe Sudetendeutsche Str. 98 90537 Feucht / DE | 03 /
GANAPATHY, Anand 711 Jurong West Street 71 No. 10-21 Singapore 640711 / SG | 04 /
NAUMANN, Frank Schönbacher Str. 30 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | 05 /
RASS, Uwe Gleisshammerstr. 132 90480 Nürnberg / DE | 06 /
LER, Gee Heng Apt Blk 217 Serangoon Avenue 4 Number 05-172 Singapore 550217 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | 01 /
BEYFUSS, Stefanie Haselhofstr. 47 91058 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
FLAIG, Uwe Sudetendeutsche Str. 98 90537 Feucht / DE | |||
03 /
GANAPATHY, Anand 711 Jurong West Street 71 No. 10-21 Singapore 640711 / SG | |||
04 /
NAUMANN, Frank Schönbacher Str. 30 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | |||
05 /
RASS, Uwe Gleisshammerstr. 132 90480 Nürnberg / DE | |||
06 /
LER, Gee Heng Block 12 Holland Avenue Singapore 272012 / SG | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 15774872.4 | 10.09.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015EP70775 | Priority number, date | DE201410218053 | 10.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014218053 | DE201410219017 | 22.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014219017 | [2017/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016038165 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3192277 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
H04R1/1041 (EP);
H04R2225/31 (EP);
H04R2225/41 (EP);
H04R2225/61 (EP,US);
H04R2460/03 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Title | German: | HÖRINSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES HÖRINSTRUMENTS | [2017/29] | English: | HEARING INSTRUMENT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING INSTRUMENT | [2017/29] | French: | APPAREILLAGE AUDITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE FAIRE FONCTIONNER | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 05.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009226013 (BURGE BENJAMIN D [US]) [X] 1-5,8,12,13,18 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 17 * * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 28 * * page 5, paragraph 42 - page 6, paragraph 43 * * figures 1-3,5,6 * * claims 1-7,12-19 *[I] 6,7,9-11,14-17; | [XAI]US2009268936 (GOLDBERG JACK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,18 * page 3, paragraph 28 - page 4, paragraph 45 * * figures 1-3,7b * * claims 1-10,20-25 * [A] 3,4,12-17 [I] 6,7,9-11 |