EP3194385 - N-(HETERO)ARYL-SUBSTITUTED HETEROYCLIC DERIVATIVES USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES OR CONDITIONS RELATED TO THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chronos Therapeutics Limited 41 Cornmarket Street Oxford OX1 3HA / GB | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREMONESI, Susanna c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 02 /
MICHELI, Fabrizio c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 03 /
SEMERARO, Teresa c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 04 /
TARSI, Luca c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | 05 /
LUKER, Tim 32 Flamingo Court Nottingham NG7 1GJ / GB | 06 /
LESLIE, Colin c/o Aptuit (Verona) S.r.l. Via Alessandro Fleming 4 I-37135 Verona / IT | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2017/30] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15774987.0 | 14.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015IB57031 | Priority number, date | GB20140016351 | 16.09.2014 Original published format: GB 201416351 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016042453 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194385 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3194385 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP3194385 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D487/04, C07D211/48, A61K31/4025, A61K31/409, A61K31/437, A61K31/4375, A61K31/4545, A61P25/00 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D211/48 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MIT DEM ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEM VERBUNDENEN ERKRANKUNGEN ODER ZUSTÄNDEN GEEIGNETE N-(HETERO)ARYL-SUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE | [2018/03] | English: | N-(HETERO)ARYL-SUBSTITUTED HETEROYCLIC DERIVATIVES USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES OR CONDITIONS RELATED TO THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | [2017/30] | French: | DERIVES HETEROCYCLIQUES N-(HETERO)ARYL SUBSTITUES UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES MALADIES OU CONDITIONS LIEES AU SYSTEME CENTRAL NERVEUX | [2018/03] |
Former [2017/30] | N-(HETERO)ARYL-SUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2017/30] | DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES SUBSTITUÉS PAR N-(HÉTÉRO)ARYLE UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES OU D'AFFECTIONS LIÉES AU SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Limitations: | 13.09.2019 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 14.10.2020 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 08.01.2021 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 14.09.2015 | [2024/28] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0149677 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 4; compound (I) * * page 4, line 18 - line 19 * * examples 1, 2 * * page 27 - page 29 * * page 29, line 15 - page 30, line 2 ** claims 10, 11 * |