|
28.04.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.01.2017 |
Published international application - A9 |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
22.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.03.2016 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
121 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
53 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |