EP3197978 - USE OF ENCAPSULATED POLYAMINES FOR LIMITING FLUID LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA OPERATIONS 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/45] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 25 rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CADIX, Arnaud 26 avenue Frayce F-93400 Saint Ouen / FR | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/31] | Cordier, Pascal Christian Rhodia Operations Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 15775137.1 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015EP72162 | Priority number, date | EP20140290292 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14290292 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016046393 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197978 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3197978 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/035, C09K8/512, C09K8/516, C09K8/68, C09K8/70, C09K8/88, C09K8/92 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
C09K8/035 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/44 (US);
C09K8/512 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/516 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/68 (US);
C09K8/685 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/70 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/887 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/92 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON VERKAPSELTEN POLYAMINEN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DES FLÜSSIGKEITSVERLUSTS | [2021/30] | English: | USE OF ENCAPSULATED POLYAMINES FOR LIMITING FLUID LOSS | [2017/31] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLYAMINES ENCAPSULÉS POUR LIMITER LA PERTE DE FLUIDE | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/31] | VERWENDUNG VON EINGEKAPSELTEN POLYAMINEN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DES FLÜSSIGKEITSVERLUSTS | ||
Former [2017/31] | UTILISATION DE POLYAMINES ENCAPSULÉES POUR LIMITER LA PERTE DE FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2015 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008223578 (BERKLAND CORY [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0038]; examples 1-3; claims 1,8 *; | [A]US2011114318 (EZELL RYAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0047] , [0048] , [0081]; claims 1,2,10,18 *; | [X]US2011237465 (LEE JESSE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * example 4; claims 9,14 *; | [Y]US2013056199 (REDDY B RAGHAVA [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0111] - [0118]; example 1; claim 11 *; | [XDY]US2014100304 (CADIX ARNAUD [FR], et al) [XD] 1-3,6-9 * examples 1,3; claims 17,12 * [Y] 1-9; | [A] - GJERTRUD MAURSTAD ET AL, "Metastable and stable states of xanthan polyelectrolyte complexes studied by atomic force microscopy", BIOPOLYMERS, (20040101), vol. 74, no. 3, doi:10.1002/bip.20073, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 199 - 213, XP055173584 [A] 1-9 * page 201 - page 203 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bip.20073 | [A] - AHMAD MORADI-ARAGHI, "A review of thermally stable gels for fluid diversion in petroleum production", JOURNAL OF PETROLEUM SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, (20000101), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0920-4105(00)00015-2, ISSN 0920-4105, pages 1 - 10, XP055173585 [A] 1-9 * pages 3,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-4105(00)00015-2 | Examination | - BUENO VANIA BLASQUES ET AL, "Synthesis and swelling behavior of xanthan-based hydrogels", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (20121101), vol. 92, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CARBPOL.2012.10.062, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 1091 - 1099, XP028972940 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2012.10.062 |