EP3198112 - MONOLITHIC MANIFOLD WITH EMBEDDED VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Technologies Do Brasil LTDA Rua Paulo Emídio Barbosa 485 Quadra 4 Parque Tecnológico Cidade Universitária 21941-615 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMES MARTINS, Luciano Rua Ana Neri 102 - 25 de agosto Duque de Caxias 25070-420 Rio de Janeiro / BR | 02 /
AUGUSTO COUTO FILHO, Paulo Av. Atlântica 778 - apto 1301 22010-000 Rio de Janeiro / BR | 03 /
CECCON DE AZEVEDO, Alex Estrada dos Menezes 400 apt. 1108 bloco camboinhas Colubandê RJ 24451-230 São Gonçalo / BR | 04 /
ZARAGOZA LABES, Alan Av dos Flamboyants 155 Bloco 3 Apartamento 503 RJ 22776-070 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/31] | 01 /
GOMES MARTINS, Luciano Rua Ana Neri 102 - 25 de agosto Duque de Caxias 25070-420 Rio de Janeiro / BR | ||
02 /
AUGUSTO COUTO FILHO, Paulo Av. Atlântica 778 - apto 1301 22010-000 Rio de Janeiro / BR | |||
03 /
CECCON DE AZEVEDO, Alex Estrada dos Menezes 400 apt. 1108 bloco camboinhas Colubandê RJ 24451-230 São Gonçalo / BR | |||
04 /
ZARAGOZA LABES, Alan Av dos Flamboyants 155 Bloco 3 Apartamento 503 22776-070 Rio De Janeiro, RJ / BR | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 15775607.3 | 18.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015BR50158 | Priority number, date | BR20141023895 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: BR102014023895 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016044910 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198112 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3198112 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B41/00, E21B43/01 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
E21B43/0175 (EP);
E21B34/04 (BR);
E21B43/0107 (US);
E21B41/0007 (EP,US);
E21B43/01 (EP,US);
E21B43/017 (EP,BR,US);
F16K11/00 (BR);
F16K3/0245 (US);
E21B43/12 (BR);
E21B43/36 (BR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOLITHISCHER VERTEILER MIT EINGEBETTETEN VENTILEN | [2017/31] | English: | MONOLITHIC MANIFOLD WITH EMBEDDED VALVES | [2017/31] | French: | COLLECTEUR MONOLITHIQUE AVEC VANNES INCORPORÉES | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 22.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2021
26.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Aker Solutions AS Postboks 94 1325 Lysaker / NO Opponent's representative Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2021/09] | 03.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 05.05.2023 | Appeal received No. T0851/23 | 05.05.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.07.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2015 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | IE | 18.09.2020 | LU | 18.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | DE | 01.04.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.09.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 18.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 18.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3957079 (WHITEMAN JACK) [A] 1-27 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 3; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0429411 (CRYOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1-27* page 4, lines 13-42; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO9833990 (KEYSTONE INT [US]) [X] 1-4,7,12-15 * page 6, line 30 - page 11, line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [YA]WO0008297 (DTC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [Y] 19,20 * page 7, lines 9-17; figure 2 * [A] 16; | [XYI]WO0052370 (ABB OFFSHORE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8,12-15,17,18,23-27 * pages 8-20; figures 1,5,10 * [Y] 19,20 [I] 9-11,16 | Examination | GB2200723 | EP0429411 | Opposition | US4711268 | US4757943 | US5277224 | WO9833990 | US5832956 | US6293305 |