EP3128989 - COMPOSITION FOR SHAVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primor, Nitsan 47 David Hamelech Street 64237 Tel Aviv / IL | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15776148.7 | 15.03.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015IL50270 | Priority number, date | US201461977110P | 09.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461977110 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015155757 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3128989 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q9/02, A61Q19/00, A61K8/02, A61K8/19, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/58, A61K31/25 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
A61Q9/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (US);
A61K31/745 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (US);
A61K8/33 (US);
A61K8/34 (US);
A61K8/342 (US);
A61K8/37 (US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/4913 (US);
A61K8/498 (US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/8182 (US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q19/002 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | A61K8/19, A61K8/02, A61Q9/02, A61K31/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM RASIEREN | [2017/07] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR SHAVING | [2017/07] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE RASAGE | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 08.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]RU2512696 (IMASHEVA MARGARITA ALEKSEEVNA [RU]) [XP] 1-3,7,13 * The two examples; page 4 - page 5 *; | [X]RU2159105 ; | [X]WO2004052326 (ANANIEV EVGENY NIKOLAEVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1-3,7,13 * examples 1-3, 1a, 1c, 2a, 2c, 3a, 3c *; | [Y]US2004247558 (ALLEF PETRA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0031] *; | [Y]US2008069790 (PETRAIA TERESA [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] *; | [X]FR2937539 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * Compositions 7-10;; examples 2-4 *; | [X]EP2363135 (PUIG ANTONIO SA [ES]) [X] 1,2,6,7,13 * example 4 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 14, Database accession no. 2001-135891, XP002774282 & RU2159105 C1 20001120 (BAKIN V M) [X] 1-3,7,13 * abstract * | International search | [XY]WO9619182 (COSMEDERM TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [X] 27, 29 * page 15 line 22- page 16 line 2, claim 31 page 15 line 22- page 16 line 23, claime 31 * [Y] 1-29; | [Y]US2013045257 (ALWATTARI ALI [US], et al) [Y] 11-29 * claims 1,4.15 *; | [Y]US2014170193 (MYHRE GUNNAR [NO]) [Y] 11-29* claim 1, paragraph 20 * |