EP3122356 - TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE THROUGH ARFGAP1 INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/05] | TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE THROUGH ARFGAP1 INHIBITION USING SUBSTITUTED PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES | ||
[2019/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dalhousie University 1344 Summer Street Suite 207 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | [2020/23] |
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Dalhousie University 1344 Summer Street Suite 207 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERGE, Michel 1344 Summer Street Suite 207 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | 02 /
MCMASTER, Chris 1344 Summer Street Suite 207 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | 03 /
ZIMMERMAN, Carla 1344 Summer Street Suite 207 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | 04 /
POON, Pak 1344 Summer Street Suite 207 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2017/05] | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15776221.2 | 10.04.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015CA50295 | Priority number, date | US201461978091P | 10.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978091 P | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015154191 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122356 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3122356 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4425, A61P25/16 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K31/4425 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D295/073 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | A61K31/4402, A61K31/381, A61P25/16, C07D213/61, A61K31/4425, C07D213/74, A61K31/495, A61K31/496, C07D295/073 | ||
Former IPC [2017/05] | A61K31/4402, A61K31/381, A61P25/16, C07D213/61, C07D295/135 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS PARKINSON DURCH ARFGAP1-HEMMUNG | [2019/51] | English: | TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE THROUGH ARFGAP1 INHIBITION | [2019/51] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON PAR INHIBITION D'ARFGAP1 | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/05] | BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS PARKINSON DURCH ARFGAP1-HEMMUNG MIT SUBSTITUIERTEN PIPERAZINDERIVATEN | ||
Former [2017/05] | TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE THROUGH ARFGAP1 INHIBITION USING SUBSTITUTED PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2017/05] | TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON PAR INHIBITION D'ARFGAP1 EN UTILISANT DES DÉRIVÉS DE PIPÉRAZINE SUBSTITUÉS | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 25.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2015 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.04.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.04.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 10.04.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 10.04.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012162254 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph 10 - page 5, paragraph 11 * * page 27, paragraph 48 * * claim 1 *; | [A] - STAFA KLODJAN ET AL, "GTPase Activity and Neuronal Toxicity of Parkinson's Disease-Associated LRRK2 Is Regulated by ArfGAP1", PLOS GENETICS, (201202), vol. 8, no. 2, XP002772924 [A] 1-3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1002526 | International search | [X]WO9728128 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 9 *example 20; example 42*; | [XY]CA2540186 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [X] 1, 2, 5, 8, 9, 13 *page 38, compound 1; page 39, compound 18; examples; claim 53* [Y] 3, 4, 6, 7, 12; | [XY]CA2568524 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [X] 1, 2, 8, 9 *claim 42; page 60, compound at line 17* [Y] 3, 4, 6, 7, 12; | [X]CA2652449 (WARATAH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA]) [X] 9 *page 144, first entry*; | [X]CA2687790 (F2G LTD [GB]) [X] 9 *reference example 40*; | [X]CA2690299 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1, 8 *abstract; table 2; claims 16 and 17*; | [X]CA2725445 (F2G LTD [GB]) [X] 9, 11 *page 117, example 78*; | [X]CA2809557 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL TECHNOLOGY [GB], et al) [X] 1, 8 *page 1, lines 3-6; page 26, compounds 13 and 14*; | [X]CA2827648 (ABBVIE INC [US]) [X] 9, 11 *example 247A*; | [XY]WO2013033037 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 8, 9, 11 *page 296, entry #6 (IND-0018629); claims 45-49, 104* [Y] 3, 4, 6, 7, 12; | [X] - LEE, B. D. et al., "Inhibitors of leucine-rich repeat kinase-2 protect against models of Parkinson's disease", Nature Medicine, (20100000), vol. 16, pages 998 - 1000, XP055230314 [X] 1, 8 * + supplementary material page 15 *abstract; table 1.1, entry 4* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2199 | [X] - FEENSTRA, R. et al., "SLV308", Drugs of the Future, (20010000), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 128 - 132, XP055230320 [X] 1, 8 *abstract* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2001.026.02.608830 | [X] - DUNCAN, M. C. et al., "Composite synthetic lethal identification of membrane traffic inhibitors", PNAS, (20070000), vol. 104, no. 15, pages 6235 - 6240, XP055230322 [X] 9, 11 *compounds 5353860, A5, S8 and S9* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0607773104 | [X] - LI, Z. et al., "Discovery and Preliminary Structure-Activity Relationship of Arylpiperazines as Novel, Brain-Penetrant Antiprion Compounds", Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20130000), vol. 4, pages 397 - 401, XP055230326 [X] 9, 11 *compounds 7 and 13* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ml300472n | [X] - FAUL, M. M. et al., "Green Chemistry Approach to the Synthesis of N-Substituted Piperidones", JOC, (20030000), vol. 68, pages 5739 - 5741, XP055230328 [X] 9, 11 *compound 12* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo026848i | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 915879-01-5 [X] 9, 14 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 296792-87-5 [X] 9, 15 | [X] - BAHNER, C. T. et al., "Qutemary Salts of Halogenated Pyridines and Quinolines", JACS, (19510000), vol. 73, pages 3499 - 3501, XP055230331 [X] 10 *table 1, entry 13* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01151a501 | by applicant | CA2809557 | WO2012162254 | - LEE, B. D. et al., Nature medicine |