EP3128972 - FIBERS AND ARTICLES INCLUDING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Neelakandan 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
PRIOLEAU, Lori-Ann S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
WOOD, Leigh E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CHAKRAVARTY, Jayant 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
STAGG, Timothy V. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15776516.5 | 10.04.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015US25250 | Priority number, date | US201461978119P | 10.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978119 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015157602 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3128972 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B5/08, A61F13/49, A61F13/56, A61F13/58, A61F13/551, B32B5/14, B32B5/24, B32B19/04, B32B19/06, B32B27/06, B32B27/32, B32B27/18, B32B27/12 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
D04H1/4374 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/541 (KR);
D04H1/5412 (EP,US);
A61F13/622 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/84 (KR,US);
B32B19/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B19/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/28 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/142 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/24 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/02 (KR);
B32B7/023 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/247 (EP,KR,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
D01F8/00 (EP,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4382 (KR);
D04H1/43828 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/43838 (EP,US);
D04H1/46 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/5414 (EP,US);
D04H1/5416 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8497 (KR,US);
B32B2262/00 (EP,US);
B32B2262/02 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0223 (EP,US);
B32B2262/023 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0238 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0292 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/00 (EP,US);
B32B2264/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/41 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/726 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2535/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2555/00 (EP,US);
B32B2555/02 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | A61F13/49, A61F13/56, A61F13/58, A61F13/551 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | FASERN UND ARTIKEL DAMIT | [2017/07] | English: | FIBERS AND ARTICLES INCLUDING THEM | [2017/07] | French: | FIBRES ET ARTICLES LES COMPRENANT | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2018634 (ALLIED CHEM) [X] 1,2,9 * claim 1 - "..d'un filament à constituants multiples", "poreuse" * * claims 2-11 * * figure - *; | [A]FR2083552 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-12 ** figure - *; | [X]US5503907 (GESSNER SCOTT L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-11 * abstract - "multicomponent fibers", "microporous" * * claim 1 - "sheath-core fibers" * * claims 2, 3 - "polypropylene" * * claims 4-18 * * figure - *; | [X]US2010159770 (WALSER SUSAN KATHLEEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11 * abstract - "multicomponent fiber" * * claims 1, 10 - "polypropylene" * * figure - * * claims 1-37 *; | [X]US2012231692 (PEYRAS-CARRATTE JEREMIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10 * abstract - "multicomponent polymeric fibers" , "porous" * * claims 1-22 * * figure - *; | [A]US2013149488 (CHANDRASEKARAN NEELAKANDAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1-20 * * figure - * | International search | [A]US4902553 (HWANG KIRK K [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * See abstract; claims 1, 8, 11; column 7, lines 28-30; figures 1, 3-4. *; | [A]US2003035943 (JONES GREGORY K [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. *; | [A]US2013149488 (CHANDRASEKARAN NEELAKANDAN [US]) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. *; | [A]US2013281950 (DIGIACOMANTONIO MARCO [IT], et al) [A] 1-16* See entire document. *; | [A]US8613736 (SCHNABEL MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. * |