Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10707027 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2019096593 | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514680834 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | US201816201715 | 27.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10153096 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2018 | B2 | US2015287546 | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514680834 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102625464B | Global Dossier | 17.01.2024 | B1 | KR20230004925 | 06.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US24766 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | KR20227013397 | 07.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102479453B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2022 | B1 | KR20220057640 | 09.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20167027115 | 07.04.2015 | WO2015US24766 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102391094B | Global Dossier | 28.04.2022 | B1 | KR20160142827 | 13.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US24766 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106165041 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US24766 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3130022 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2020 | B1 | EP3130022 | 15.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US24766 | 07.04.2015 | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015157324 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2016 | A3 | WO2015157324 | 15.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201461976977 | 08.04.2014 |