EP3201353 - A METHOD OF IDENTIFYING OR PRODUCING AN APTAMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinische Friedrich-Wilhelms-Universität Bonn Regina-Pacis-Weg 3 53113 Bonn / DE | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYER, Guenter Martin-Legros-Str. 59 53123 Bonn / DE | 02 /
TOLLE, Fabian 8 Showground Close CB2 9AA, Cambridge / GB | [2017/42] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
MAYER, Guenter Martin-Legros-Str. 59 53123 Bonn / DE | ||
02 /
TOLLE, Fabian Hermann-Wandersleb-Ring 8 53121 Bonn / DE | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15777645.1 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015EP72566 | Priority number, date | US201462058703P | 02.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462058703 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016050850 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201353 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3201353 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6811, C12N15/10, C12N15/11 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/1048 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/115 (US);
C12Q1/6811 (EP,US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12N15/1048, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/205, C12Q2541/101 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6811, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/205, C12Q2541/101 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/32] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C12N15/115 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG ODER HERSTELLUNG EINES APTAMERS | [2017/32] | English: | A METHOD OF IDENTIFYING OR PRODUCING AN APTAMER | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION OU DE PRODUCTION D'UN APTAMÈRE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 02.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2017 | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2015 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.09.2015 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009012410 (SOMALOGIC INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [XY]US2011210017 (LAI REBECCA Y [US], et al) [X] 10,12 * example 3 * [Y] 11,13-15; | [YA]US2012115752 (ZICHI DOMINIC [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * paragraph [0128] * [A] 1-13; | [Y]US2014100120 (GORENSTEIN DAVID G [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 9; example 3 *; | [XPY]WO2015049356 (TOLLE FABIAN [DE], et al) [XP] 1-13 * claims 1-8 * * the whole document * [Y] 14,15; | [XY] - YUNFENG CHENG ET AL, "Design, Synthesis, and Polymerase-Catalyzed Incorporation of Click-Modified Boronic Acid-TTP Analogues", CHEMISTRY - AN ASIAN JOURNAL, (20111004), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:10.1002/asia.201100229, ISSN 1861-4728, pages 2747 - 2752, XP055160640 [X] 10,12 * page 2748, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 2750, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 2,4 * [Y] 1-9,11,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/asia.201100229 | [XY] - SAMRA OBEID ET AL, "Interactions of non-polar and "Click-able" nucleotides in the confines of a DNA polymerase active site", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20120101), vol. 48, no. 67, doi:10.1039/c2cc34181f, ISSN 1359-7345, page 8320, XP055160951 [X] 10,12 * page 8320 - page 8321; figure 1 * [Y] 11,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2cc34181f | [XY] - GRAMLICH PHILIPP M E ET AL, "Postsynthetic DNA modification through the copper-catalyzed azide-alkyne cycloaddition reaction", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, vol. 47, no. 44, doi:10.1002/ANIE.200802077, ISSN 1433-7851, (20081020), pages 8350 - 8358, (20080922), XP009120328 [X] 10,12 * Scheme 6; page 8355, column 2, paragraph 7 * [Y] 11,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200802077 | [XYI] - PHILIPP M E GRAMLICH ET AL, "Click?Click?Click: Single to Triple Modification of DNA", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, vol. 47, no. 18, doi:10.1002/ANIE.200705664, ISSN 1433-7851, (20080101), pages 3442 - 3444, (20080328), XP007916867 [X] 10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15 [I] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200705664 | [Y] - KEEFE A D ET AL, "SELEX with modified nucleotides", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD, LONDON, GB, vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CBPA.2008.06.028, ISSN 1367-5931, (20080801), pages 448 - 456, (20080721), XP024528065 [Y] 1-15 * page 452, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 454, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1, 2a,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2008.06.028 | [Y] - MAYER G ET AL, "From selection to caged aptamers: Identification of light-dependent ssDNA aptamers targeting cytohesin", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, no. 23, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2009.10.032, ISSN 0960-894X, (20091201), pages 6561 - 6564, (20091014), XP026736055 [Y] 7,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.10.032 | [Y] - CLARA BRIEKE ET AL, "Light-Controlled Tools", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20120820), vol. 51, no. 34, doi:10.1002/anie.201202134, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 8446 - 8476, XP055160738 [Y] 7,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201202134 | [Y] - FABIAN TOLLE ET AL, "Dressed for success - applying chemistry to modulate aptamer functionality", CHEMICAL SCIENCE, (20130101), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1039/c2sc21510a, ISSN 2041-6520, page 60, XP055160479 [Y] 1-15 * pages 61,63,64; figures 4B,5 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C2SC21510A | [Y] - VARATHARASA THIVIYANATHAN ET AL, "Aptamers and the next generation of diagnostic reagents", PROTEOMICS - CLINICAL APPLICATIONS, (20121215), vol. 6, no. 11-12, doi:10.1002/prca.201200042, ISSN 1862-8346, pages 563 - 573, XP055160488 [Y] 1-15 * page 565, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prca.201200042 | [Y] - LATHAM J A ET AL, "The application of a modified nucleotide in aptamer selection : novel thrombin aptamers containing 5-(1-pentynyl)-2'-deoxyuridine", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (19940101), vol. 22, no. 14, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2817 - 2822, XP002176163 [Y] 1-9 * page 2818, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | [Y] - MOHAMMAD MEHEDI MASUD ET AL, "Sialyllactose-binding modified DNA aptamer bearing additional functionality by SELEX", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20040301), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.bmc.2003.12.009, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1111 - 1120, XP055160822 [Y] 1-9 * page 1112 - page 1113; figure 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2003.12.009 | [A] - KOLB H C ET AL, "The growing impact of click chemistry on drug discovery", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20031215), vol. 8, no. 24, doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(03)02933-7, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 1128 - 1137, XP002377521 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(03)02933-7 |