EP3189361 - CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUDERKIRK, Andrew J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
YUN, Zhisheng 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
WONG, Timothy L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
MCDOWELL, Erin A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
AMBUR, Gregg A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15777809.3 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US52229 | Priority number, date | US201562214049P | 03.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562214049 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017039719 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189361 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02B17/08, G02B27/01 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
B29D11/00644 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/02 (KR);
G02B27/0172 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C55/04 (KR);
B29D11/0073 (EP,KR);
B29D11/00865 (EP,KR);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B32B37/06 (KR);
B32B37/08 (KR);
B32B38/0012 (KR);
G02B1/10 (CN,KR);
G02B13/0055 (EP,KR,US);
G02B17/0804 (KR,US);
G02B17/0856 (EP,KR,US);
G02B17/0896 (EP,KR,US);
G02B21/04 (KR);
G02B27/0068 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0081 (KR,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,KR);
G02B27/0101 (CN,KR);
G02B27/0176 (KR);
G02B27/0905 (KR,US);
G02B27/0983 (KR,US);
G02B27/144 (KR,US);
G02B27/145 (KR,US);
G02B27/148 (KR,US);
G02B27/28 (CN);
G02B27/283 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B27/286 (KR,US);
G02B5/30 (CN,US);
G02B5/3041 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B5/305 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B5/3058 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B5/3066 (KR,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/021 (KR);
G03B17/00 (CN,KR);
G03B21/28 (KR,US);
B32B2551/00 (KR);
G02B2027/011 (EP,KR,US);
G02B2027/0118 (CN,KR);
G02B2027/0123 (CN,KR);
G02B2027/013 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B2027/0138 (KR,US);
G02B2027/0194 (CN,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERA | [2017/28] | English: | CAMERA | [2017/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRISE DE VUES | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 04.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9619746 (SILISCAPE INC [US]); | [A]WO9930199 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]WO0070386 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [Y]WO0102893 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP1096293 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XYI]US6266194 (TANIJIRI YASUSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007139900 (CREATIVE DISPLAY SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | US5882774 | US6271969 | US2002180916 | US2003028048 | US6609795 | US6788463 | US2005072959 | US6916440 | US7242525 | US2010254002 | US8780039 |