EP3198272 - CARTRIDGE DEVICE IDENTIFICATION FOR COAGULATION ASSAYS IN FLUID SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Point Of Care, Inc. 400 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Jay Kendall 354 Gladstone Avenue Apt. 328 Ottawa, Ontario K2P 0R4 / CA | 02 /
ZHAO, Tian-Xian 20 Bishops Mills Way Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3B9 / CA | 03 /
BALL, Sheila Diane 8 Harmon Way Kanata, Ontario K2L 3W1 / CA | 04 /
HARDAGE, Kenneth Harold 283 Bayswater Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 2G9 / CA | 05 /
BREEZE, Steven Roy 30 McEwen Avenue Apt. 1102 Ottawa, Ontario K2B 5K8 / CA | 06 /
NEWLANDS, Joshua David 4724 Stonecrest Road RR 2 Woodlawn, Ontario K0A 3M0 / CA | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Serravalle, Marco, et al Marco Serravalle S.L. Calle Galicia, 18 - Apt. E5 38660 Adeje / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Serravalle, Marco, et al Marco Serravalle S.L. Residence Los Girasoles Avenida Kurt Konrad Mayer 67, apt 16 38660 Adeje / ES | ||
Former [2017/31] | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via G. Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 15777819.2 | 25.09.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015US52399 | Priority number, date | US201462055922P | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462055922 P | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016049552 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3198272 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3198272 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, B01L3/00 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP);
B01L3/5027 (EP,CN,US);
G01N27/403 (US);
G01N33/4905 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0672 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0688 (EP,CN,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTUSCHENVORRICHTUNGSIDENTIFIZIERUNG FÜR BLUTGERINNUNGSTESTS IN FLÜSSIGEN PROBEN | [2017/31] | English: | CARTRIDGE DEVICE IDENTIFICATION FOR COAGULATION ASSAYS IN FLUID SAMPLES | [2017/31] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE DISPOSITIF DE CARTOUCHE POUR ANALYSES DE COAGULATION DANS DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE FLUIDE | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 15.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2015 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | MT | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | TR | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | GB | 25.09.2022 | IE | 25.09.2022 | LU | 25.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
TR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
GB | 25.09.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
GB | 25.09.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
GB | 25.09.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.09.2015 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
GB | 25.09.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
GB | 25.09.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
GB | 25.09.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03023389 (HYPOGUARD LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * claims 12,14,27,29,30,31 * [Y] 2-5,7-10,12-14; | [Y]WO03076937 (I STAT CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7-10,12-14* page 22, line 15 - line 21; figure 9 * | by applicant | US4756884 | US4954087 | US5096669 | US5200051 | US5344754 | US5447440 | US5514253 | US5554339 | US5628961 | US5821399 | US6379883 | US6438498 | US6750053 | US7419821 | US7923256 | US7977106 |