EP3201727 - USER INTERFACE SYSTEM BASED ON POINTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNING DE VRIES, Hendricus T. Gerardus Maria c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KOLL, Robert Heinz c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
TICHELAAR, Johannes Yzebrand c/o High TechCampus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15777905.9 | 30.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015EP72530 | Priority number, date | EP20140187126 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14187126 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016050828 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201727 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06F3/0346 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0325 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V40/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM AUF DER BASIS EINER ZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/32] | English: | USER INTERFACE SYSTEM BASED ON POINTING DEVICE | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR BASÉ SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE POINTAGE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2019 | 09.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/40] | 25.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009009469 (HSU FENG-HSIUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0085]; figure 10 * [I] 6; | [A]US2014191959 (KAO MING-TSAN [TW], et al) [A] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0055]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2008284724 (ALTEN BRETT G [US]) [A] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1, 4 * | Examination | WO2004047011 | EP1717672 |